New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:24-cv-00177
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2sh Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Brian Adams
Represented By
Rodianna Katsaros
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Howard Keith Belfield, Jr
Littler
contact info
Rodianna Katsaros
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Lattina Brown
585 Stewart Avenue Suite 410
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Joshua Mathew Friedman
Phillips & Associates, Attorneys At Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/02 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 4/29/2025. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/21 3:03 PM
ORDER granting43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 5/19/2025. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/21/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
43 43 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/18 5:00 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Restore this Action addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Plaintiff, Lattina Brown dated 04/18/25. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/18 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Tuesday, April 29, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. Please call Chambers at (212) 8050260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/18/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 04/10 12:28 PM
ORDER granting39 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Bryan Carr Olert terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/10/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/02 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 4/10/2025. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
40 40 order Order Tue 04/08 6:27 PM
ORDER The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Thursday, April 10, 2025, at 10:00 a.m., for Plaintiff's counsel only. Please call Chambers at (212) 805-0260. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (vgnc)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 04/08 1:30 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Bryan Olert, New Attorney: Christopher Arko . Document filed by Brian Adams, City of New York..(Arko, Christopher)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Substitution of Attorney Tue 04/08 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Bryan Olert, New Attorney: Christopher Arko, Address: New York City Law Department, 100 Church Street, New York, NY, 10007, 212-356-5044. Document filed by Brian Adams, City of New York..(Arko, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/27 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 3/25/2025. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 03/20 5:17 PM
ORDER granting36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/20/2025) Motions due by 4/20/2025. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
36 36 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/19 11:56 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Restore Action addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua Friedman dated 3/19/2025. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
35 35 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/18 3:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Tuesday, March 25, 2025 a 2:15 p.m. for Defense counsel only. Please call Chambers at 2128050260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2025 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/18/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/18 3:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Tuesday, March 25, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. for Plaintiff's counsel only. Please call Chambers at 2128050260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/18/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/20 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 3/18/2025. (Quinn, Diane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
33 33 order Memo Endorsement Fri 03/07 5:41 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:32 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Bryan Carr Olert dated March 7, 2025. filed by Brian Adams, City of New York ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The conference currently scheduled for March 11 is ADJOURNED to March 18, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/7/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 03/07 4:32 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Bryan Carr Olert dated March 7, 2025. Document filed by City of New York, Brian Adams..(Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email Communications
31 31 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/07 11:08 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Tuesday, March 11, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. Please call Chambers at 2128050260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/7/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/07 5:53 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Carr Olert on behalf of City of New York, Brian Adams..(Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/04 11:46 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/4/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 motion Conference Mon 03/03 6:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua Friedman dated March 3, 2025. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/21 2:42 PM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 3/21/2025. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/21/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/20 1:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Restore Action addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua Friedman dated 2/20/2025. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Tue 01/21 4:15 PM
ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that this case has been settled. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. Any application to reopen this action must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order, and any application filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/21/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Fri 01/17 4:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bryan Carr Olert dated 1.17.2025 re: the parties have reached a settlement in principle. Document filed by City of New York, Brian Adams..(Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE..(Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 10/08 1:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 10/8/2024. Mediation Status due by 11/7/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 09/04 4:58 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/12 3:35 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Brian Adams, City of New York..(Katsaros, Rodianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Myers on behalf of Lattina Brown..(Myers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/12 4:16 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams.,17 Amended Complaint,.Application granted. SO ORDERED. Brian Adams answer due 8/12/2024; City of New York answer due 8/12/2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/12/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/12 10:30 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Document filed by Brian Adams, City of New York..(Katsaros, Rodianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/28 6:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Brian Adams, City of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lattina Brown. Related document:1 Complaint..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue
Monday, June 24, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 06/24 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/24/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 06/24 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/24/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 06/14 10:53 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/28/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/10 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Adams, City of New York..(Katsaros, Rodianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/15 4:25 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rodianna Katsaros dated May 10, 2024.,1 Complaint. Application granted. Brian Adams answer due 6/11/2024; City of New York answer due 6/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/15/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/10 11:42 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rodianna Katsaros dated May 10, 2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Katsaros, Rodianna)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rodianna Katsaros on behalf of City of New York..(Katsaros, Rodianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/13 4:42 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline is extended for both Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/12/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/13 4:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Brian Adams answer due 5/11/2024; City of New York answer due 5/11/2024. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/12 1:22 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Document filed by City of New York..(Belfield, Howard)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Keith Belfield, Jr on behalf of City of New York..(Belfield, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/06 12:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brian Adams served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Paa Quagliano (Co-Worker). Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Phillips, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/31 12:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 11:17 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 11:16 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Adams..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/10 11:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/10 11:15 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/10 11:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/09 6:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Adams, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/09 6:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/09 5:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/09 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Brian Adams, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28789287)Document filed by Lattina Brown..(Friedman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue