Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Patricia A Sullivan
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00015
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
United Natural Foods, Inc.
313 Iron Horse Way
Providence, RI 02908
Represented By
Paul M. Kessimian
Partridge, Snow & Hahn LLP
contact info
Christian R Jenner
Partridge Snow & Hahn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Omaha Industries, Inc.
1125 S 103rd St, Suite 800
Omaha, NE 68124
Represented By
Andrew S. Tugan
Koley Jessen P.C., L.L.O.
contact info
Dillon R. Ellis
Koley Jessen P.C., L.L.O.
contact info
John V. Matson
Koley Jessen P.C., L.L.O.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order Entering Stipulation Fri 11/08 1:28 PM
TEXT Order Entering21 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/8/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 10/01 12:43 PM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Omaha Industries, Inc.. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 07/08 4:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Video Settlement Conference held on 7/8/2024. (Courtroom Video at 2:00 pm.) (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
20 20 10 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 8:54 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/18/2024. (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 06/20 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER granting18 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/20/2024. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 6/20/2024 (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/17 2:08 PM
NOTICE by Omaha Industries, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel as to Dillon R. Ellis Only (Ellis, Dillon)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Protective Order Mon 06/17 11:30 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Omaha Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2024.(Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Stipulated Protective Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Fri 05/10 10:20 AM
NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing: Video Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 964 7665, Passcode: 035249) (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/10 10:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Scheduling Conference held on 5/10/2024 with Attorneys Andrew Tugan, John Matson, Christian Jenner and Paul Kessimian. ( Video Conference at 10:01.) (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Mon 05/06 8:31 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing:Video Settlement Conference to Discuss Scheduling of Settlement Conference rescheduled for 5/22/2024 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Moved from 5/15/2024.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 805 1396, Passcode: 591414) (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
notice Hearing Cancelled Mon 05/06 11:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED - Video Settlement Conference to Discuss Scheduling of Settlement Conference CANCELLED for 5/22/2024 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. ERROR: DOCKETED IN THE WRONG CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD. (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Mon 05/06 11:49 AM
CORRECTED NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing: VIDEO Scheduling Conference to Discuss Scheduling a Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Not a Public Conference. No Public will be admitted. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619206023 Meeting ID: 161 920 6023 Passcode: 105432 (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Docket Entry Mon 05/06 11:54 AM
CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: AMENDED NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing: Video Settlement Conference to Discuss Scheduling of Settlement Conference rescheduled for 5/22/2024 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. ERROR: DOCKETED IN THE WRONG CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD. CORRECTION: VIDEO Scheduling Conference to Discuss Scheduling a Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 05/03 8:26 AM
SCHEDULINGORDER, (Initial Disclosures due by 5/29/2024; Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2024; Motion to compel written discovery responses shall be made by November 15, 2024. Factual Discovery to close by 12/16/2024;, Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/5/2025;, Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/15/2025;Any expert rebuttals shall be made by May 15, 2025; Expert Discovery to close by 7/1/2025;Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed by August 15, 2025; Pretrial Memorandum due by 9/16/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan; Jury selection set for November 12, 2025, subject to further order of the Court. ). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/3/2024. (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred Fri 05/03 3:31 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Settlement Conference preferably to be conducted in June 2024. (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
minutes Rule 16 Conference Mon 04/29 4:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Rule 16 Conference held on 4/29/2024 with Attorneys Jenner, Kessimian, Matson, Tugan, Ellis. (Video Conference at 4:01.) (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Fri 04/12 10:19 AM
NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing:Video Rule 16 Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 04:00 PM EST before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 722 6649, Passcode: 311916) (Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 04/12 7:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Parties signed Consent to Jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. As the consent of a majority of the judges must consent to this designation, see 28 USC 636, the Court construes this filing as a motion. The Motion is GRANTED as a majority of the judges in this district have consented. The Parties are reminded that the magistrate judge is, as a result of this designation, empowered to exercise jurisdiction and enter judgment in this case.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/12/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/12 1:22 PM
District Judge Mary S. McElroy no longer assigned to case. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/12 1:22 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
notice Hearing Cancelled Thu 03/21 12:58 PM
HEARING CANCELLED : Rule 16 Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy is hereby cancelled. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 misc Rule 16 Statement Thu 03/14 3:50 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Omaha Industries, Inc.. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 3:27 PM
MOTION for Dillon R. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1973280 ) filed by Omaha Industries, Inc.. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 3:23 PM
MOTION for John V. Matson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1973272 ) filed by Omaha Industries, Inc.. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 3:32 PM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John V. Matson. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/13/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dillon R. Ellis. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/13/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Thu 03/07 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 623 7994, Passcode: 538252) (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/01 4:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by United Natural Foods, Inc..(Jenner, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
order Order Entering Stipulation Thu 02/22 12:30 PM
TEXT Order Entering8 STIPULATION. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/22/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/22 12:31 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: United Natural Foods, Inc. answer due 3/1/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/29 2:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 01/29 2:08 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint extending time to respond filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Jenner on behalf of United Natural Foods, Inc. (Jenner, Christian)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Kessimian on behalf of United Natural Foods, Inc. (Kessimian, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/29 2:35 PM
Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/17 3:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omaha Industries, Inc.. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/17 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omaha Industries, Inc.. Omaha Industries, Inc. served on 1/12/2024, answer due 2/2/2024. (Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/09 4:18 PM
Summons Issued as to United Natural Foods, Inc. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Tue 01/09 4:15 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Tue 01/09 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1950838 ), filed by Omaha Industries, Inc..(Tugan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/09 4:15 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]