Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Alston
Case #: 2:24-bk-10039
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jul 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Moving & Storage Solutions, Inc.
3836 Williamson Way
Bellingham, WA 98226-9156
Represented By
Thomas D Neeleman
Neeleman Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Hilary Bramwell Mohr
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:04 PM PDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
order Close Chapter 11 Case with Final Decree Fri 10/25 8:08 AM
CLOSED CASE. Given the entry of a Final Decree and Order Closing Case herein, the case is hereby administratively closed. Gina Zadra Walton, Clerk . (MT)
Related: [-]