Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Referred: Henry J Bemporad
Case #: 5:24-cv-00011
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
State of Colorado
Defendant
State of Maryland
Defendant
State of Michigan
Defendant
State of Missouri
Defendant
State of North Carolina
Defendant
State of Rhode Island
Defendant
State of Texas
Defendant
State of Virginia
Defendant
United States Army
Defendant
United States Navy
Plaintiff
Amber Marie Diale
2023 PMB 454 P.O. Box 1133
Richmond, VA 23218

GPO Mar 22 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Complaint filed by Amber Marie Diale. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
GPO Apr 15 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations. Consistent with § 636(b)(1)(C) and Rule 72(b)(2), the Court has reviewed the subject R&R for clear error on the face of the record. The Court finds no such error. Plaintiffs failure to keep the Court apprised of her current address does not excuse her failure to respond. Nor does itaffect the viability of her filed complaint. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS the Magistrate Judges recommendation (ECF No. 10). As recommended, the Court DISMISSES this action for failure of Plaintiff to file a non-frivolous claim upon which relief can be granted.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 15, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Mon 04/15 11:32 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Mon 04/15 11:31 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for10 Report and Recommendations. Consistent with § 636(b)(1)(C) and Rule 72(b)(2), the Court has reviewed the subject R&R for clear error on the face of the record. The Court finds no such error. Plaintiffs failure to keep the Court apprised of her current address does not excuse her failure to respond. Nor does itaffect the viability of her filed complaint. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS the Magistrate Judges recommendation (ECF No. 10). As recommended, the Court DISMISSES this action for failure of Plaintiff to file a non-frivolous claim upon which relief can be granted.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
15 15 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/16 5:50 PM
Sealed Document filed. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/22 3:45 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASES TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Report and Recommendations Fri 03/22 12:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re5 Complaint filed by Amber Marie Diale. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/22 3:47 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 03/22 5:00 PM
Mailed R&R10 via Certified Mail (see case 5:24-CV-11-JKP for tracking #) (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 02/27 5:21 PM
ORDER DENYING7 Motion to Withdraw7 MOTION to Withdraw5 Complaint,8 MOTION to Withdraw5 Complaint ; DENYING8 Motion to Withdraw7 MOTION to Withdraw5 Complaint,8 MOTION to Withdraw5 Complaint Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
8 8 motion Withdraw Document Wed 02/14 9:48 AM
PRO-SE MOTION to Withdraw5 Complaint by Amber Marie Diale.***Possible duplicate filing of document7 *** Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 motion Withdraw Document Thu 02/08 4:06 PM
PRO-SE NOTICE & MOTION to Withdraw/Amend5 Complaint by Amber Marie Diale.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order Thu 02/01 6:01 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Amber Marie Diale.(mgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/31 11:50 AM
Text Order GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (See Docket Entry 4.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (HJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/30 3:50 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE--It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 20, 2024, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE why her case should not be dismissed under 1915(e). She may make the required showing by filing an amended complaint, of no more than ten (10) pages, plainly stating a non-frivolous, factually supported claim for relief. Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2024. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/23 4:17 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL MAGISTRATE JUDGE, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/23 4:20 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad.. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
2 2 misc Case Opening Letter Tue 01/09 5:02 PM
Case Opening Letter to Amber Marie Diale. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/09 5:01 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amber Marie Diale.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet