Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:24-cv-00046
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Defendant
Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS 20 Massachusetts Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Washington DC, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Afifa Haba
Represented By
Deeba Anwari
The Anwari Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammad Salim Haba
Represented By
Deeba Anwari
The Anwari Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMIULLAH GULNABI HARIFI


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/10 11:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMIULLAH GULNABI HARIFI (Anwari, Deeba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 order So Ordered Tue 03/19 8:52 AM
So Ordered in re5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Afifa Haba. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/19/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/18 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Afifa Haba (Anwari, Deeba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 01/11 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 01/10 1:54 PM
Proposed Summons by Afifa Haba, Mohammad Salim Haba. (Anwari, Deeba)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/10 1:37 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Afifa Haba, Mohammad Salim Haba. (Anwari, Deeba)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/10 1:30 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9302719.), filed by Afifa Haba, Mohammad Salim Haba.(Anwari, Deeba)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 01/11 9:03 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil)
Related: [-]