New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:24-cv-00206
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
Patrick J. White
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Brandon E. Chancey
Represented By
Alexander R. Klein
Barket Epstein Kearon Aldea & Loturco, LLP
contact info
Bruce A. Barket
Barket Marion Epstein & Kearon LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Patrick J. White
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
David Schmidt
Cross Defendant
Christopher M. Paradise
Cross Defendant
P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Eric P. Lesak
Cross Defendant
Timothy James King
Cross Defendant
Brandon E. Chancey
Represented By
Alexander R. Klein
Barket Epstein Kearon Aldea & Loturco, LLP
contact info
Bruce A. Barket
Barket Marion Epstein & Kearon LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Timothy James King
Defendant
Patrick J. White
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher M. Paradise
Defendant
Eric P. Lesak
Defendant
Brandon E. Chancey
Represented By
Alexander R. Klein
Barket Epstein Kearon Aldea & Loturco, LLP
contact info
Bruce A. Barket
Barket Marion Epstein & Kearon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Defendant
David Schmidt
Defendant
P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By
Francesco P. Tini
Tini Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Annamarie F. Eakins
Represented By
Kenneth G. Walsh
Law Office Of Kenneth G. Walsh
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 05/05 1:51 PM
ORDER: According to Plaintiffs' letter motion filed on 5/4/2025 (which was a Sunday) and which contains an excessive number of footnotes, pro se Defendant Patrick White previously leased several storage units at CubeSmart Self Storage, 909 Stewart Avenue, Bethpage, New York and placed potentially responsive documents and items in those units. Letter Motion at 2. Mr. White apparently has failed to pay the fees on these units and, according to Plaintiffs, "the two remaining units 1504 and 1525 are set be auctioned off on May 15, 2025, less than two weeks from now." Id. During his recent deposition on 4/15/2025, Mr. White testified that the contents of these units are "fully secured" and "I'll pay for it... I am not worried about that. One way or another. I'm not going to let that disappear." Ex. A to Letter Motion at 5. In light of the auction set for 5/15/2025, Plaintiffs "request an immediate informal conference with the Court for a pre-motion discovery conference under Local Civil Rule 37.2... [and that Mr. White's] answer should be stricken and sanctions imposed." Letter Motion at 1. Plaintiffs argue that "[h]is answer should be stricken and sanctions imposed if [Mr. White] allows the contents of those units to be auctioned off." Id. at 3. It is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendant White shall ensure that the contents of the aforementioned CubeSmart units 1504 and 1525 are preserved and are not disposed of or placed outside his control; (2) Defendant White shall ensure that the contents of units 1504 and 1525 are made available for inspection by Plaintiffs' counsel; (3) Defendant White shall confirm by 5/14/2025 by regular mail to the Court (100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY 11722) or email to chambers (dunst_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov) that he has complied with this Order; and (4) any failure by Defendant White to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions or other relief . In light of this Order, Plaintiffs' motion for "an immediate informal conference with the Court" is DENIED. Any and all other relief requested by Plaintiffs in the 5/4/2025 letter motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall submit a Status Report by 5/21/2025 and shall refrain from the excessive use of footnotes. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on all Defendants (except for Mr. Brandon Chancey) and file evidence of service on ECF by 5/6/2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 5/5/2025. (GS)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 05/05 2:17 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's inherent authority to manage the cases before it, see Dietz v. Bouldin , 579 U.S. 40, 47 (2016) ("[D]istrict courts have the inherent authority to manage their dockets and courtrooms with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases."), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file all future motions, letters, status reports, and case filings only in Keith v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al , 2:23-cv-09461-SJB-LGD, which is now designated as lead case for the following related subsidiary cases: Eakins v. Austin Lloyd, Inc et al , 24-cv-00206-SJB-LGD Nowell v. Austin Coins, Inc et al , 24-cv-00218-SJB-LGD Fikse v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al , 24-cv-00220-SJB-LGD Grindle v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al , 24-cv-01125-SJB-LGD Gogoe v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al , 24-cv-01307-SJB-LGD Cleary v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al , 24-cv-01662-SJB-LGD Von Nolde v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al , 24-cv-06998-SJB-LGD Horn-Bostel v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al , 24-cv-07131-SJB-LGD Tanner v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al , 24-cv-08219-SJB-LGD Morris v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al , 25-cv-00237-SJB-LGD The parties are permitted to file requests in the related subsidiary cases only when there is a matter specific to that case that requires separate filing. Finally, from now on, the Court will issue all orders--including scheduling orders, minute orders, and status report orders-- only in the lead case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 5/5/2025. (GS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
105 105 misc Letter Sun 05/04 2:26 PM
Letter for immediate informal conference under Local Civil Rule 37.2 by Annamarie F. Eakins (Walsh, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit