New York Southern District Court
Judge:Barbara C Moses
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:24-cv-00197
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Glenwood Management Corp.
Represented By
Adam Granek Guttell
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Jenna Eurell
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Carole Pittelman
Represented By
Adam Granek Guttell
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Jenna Eurell
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlie Currin
175 West 60th Street Apt. 30F
New York, NY 10023


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
46 46 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 05/15 4:41 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:45 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal in favor of Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman against Charlie Currin. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Stipulation and Order of Dismissal dated May 15, 2024, that this action shall be dismissed with prejudice as against Defendants GLENWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. and CAROLE PITTELMAN, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party as against the other; IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, CHARLIE CURRIN, and the duly authorized attorneys of record for Defendant, GLENWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. that Plaintiff shall be enjoined from bringing any future Action against Glenwood Parties; WHEREFORE, the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety and Plaintiff is enjoined from bringing any future Action against Glenwood Parties. Accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/15/2024) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
45 45 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Wed 05/15 4:22 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ENJOINMENT FROM FILING RELATED LITIGATIONS: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, CHARLIE CURRIN, and the duly authorized attorneys of record for Defendants, GLENWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. and CAROLE PITTELMAN, that the above-entitled action shall be dismissed with prejudice as against Defendants GLENWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. and CAROLE PITTELMAN, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party as against the other; IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, CHARLIE CURRIN, and the duly authorized attorneys of record for Defendant, GLENWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. that Plaintiff shall be enjoined from bringing any future Action against Glenwood Parties; WHEREFORE, the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety and Plaintiff is enjoined from bringing any future Action against Glenwood Parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close the case. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/15/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk Wed 05/15 4:23 PM
Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re:45 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal to the Orders and Judgments Clerk..(rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
44 44 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 05/14 4:12 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
43 43 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/09 12:06 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charlie Currin, Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 5/9/2024).(tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/07 4:41 PM
ORDER: The parties have informed the Court that they will submit a stipulation of dismissal. It is hereby ORDERED that any such stipulation be submitted no later than May 14, 2024. In light of the anticipated dismissal, all current pretrial deadlines are hereby VACATED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/7/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 05/07 4:31 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/07 1:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Status Conference held on 5/7/2024. (tk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
40 40 misc Letter Mon 05/06 1:15 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Adam G. Guttell dated May 3, 2024 re: Magistrate Moses' 4-30-24 Order [Dkt. 37]. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel - Limited Appearance Fri 05/03 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Charlie Currin..(Toes, Susanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Thu 05/02 10:58 AM
ORDER granting36 Letter Motion for Conference re:36 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Telephone) addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Adam G. Guttell dated April 30, 2024. Application GRANTED to the extent that the Court will hold a conference on May 7, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. This is an in-person proceeding. Prior to the conference, and no later than May 6, 2024, defendants shall submit the correspondence they have received from plaintiff regarding the proposed stipulation of dismissal. Plaintiff shall bring with him to the conference any documents he proposes defendants should sign. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/2/124) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
38 38 misc Letter Thu 05/02 2:57 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Charlie Currin re: Plaintiff writes regarding his health condition and encloses photos. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
36 36 motion Conference Tue 04/30 2:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference (Telephone) addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Adam G. Guttell dated April 30, 2024. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
35 35 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/24 6:47 PM
ORDER: In light of plaintiff's pro se status and because it is not clear to the Court whether he intended his April 17 letter to constitute his substantive response to defendants' motion to dismiss the Court hereby GRANTS an additional two-week extension, through May 1, 2024, for plaintiff to file his papers in opposition to that motion. Plaintiff is reminded that the motion asks this Court to dismiss his case. Defendants argue, among other things, that when he settled his previous cases in 2023, plaintiff released (gave up) As further set forth in this order. If plaintiff wishes to oppose the motion to dismiss, he must submit a memorandum, no later than May 1, 2024, explaining why notwithstanding the settlement and dismissal of his previous lawsuits he should be permitted to sue Glenwood again. No further extensions will be granted absent compelling circumstances. Defendants' reply papers will be due May 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/24/2024) ( Responses due by 5/1/2024, Replies due by 5/8/2024.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Wed 04/17 6:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Charlie Currin re: I am asking for an extension of time for my case. Document filed by Charlie Currin. (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/16 3:28 PM
ORDER with respect to23 Motion to Dismiss. Despite multiple reminders and a sua sponte extension of plaintiff's response deadline (see Dkts. 28, 30, 31), plaintiff has not filed any opposition to defendants' motion (Dkt. 23) to dismiss his Complaint, and his extended response deadline, which was April 12, 2024, has now expired. Consequently, the Court now considers defendants' motion unopposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/16/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
32 32 misc Letter Fri 04/12 10:09 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Charlie Currin dated 4/11/2024 re: thanks to the Court, and wishes to continue this case and to remain pro se. Document filed by Charlie Currin..(tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/10 1:17 PM
ORDER: As the Court has twice reminded plaintiff (see Dkts. 28, 30), his deadline to oppose defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. 23) was April 5, 2024. That date has now passed. In light of the fact that plaintiff is still representing himself, the Court sua sponte EXTENDS his deadline to respond to the motion to April 12, 2024. Should plaintiff fail to respond by this date, the Court will consider plaintiff's motion unopposed. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 4/12/2024) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/10/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/28 5:58 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's letter dated March 28, 2024. (Dkt. 29.) Although plaintiff's deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. 23) is April 5, 2024, plaintiff's letter does not appear to be addressed to that motion. Instead, the March 28 letter serves only to reiterate a sentiment that plaintiff has already expressed on multiple occasions (see, e.g., Dkts. 1-1, 15, 19), namely that, in his view, defendants' conduct has been "shameful." Any further repetitive submissions in this vein will be summarily stricken from the record. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/28/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Letter Thu 03/28 10:50 AM
LETTER from Charlie Currin re: Reasonable accommodation request. Document filed by Charlie Currin..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/26 5:50 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss is April 5, 2024. See Local Civ. R. 6.1(b). If plaintiff requires an extension of this deadline in light of his retention of counsel, his counsel may, after filing a notice of appearance, make that request by letter-motion, explaining the reasons why an extension would be appropriate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/26/2024) ( Responses due by 4/5/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Mon 03/25 11:19 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Charlie Currin dated 3/21/2024 re: Lawyer secured..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
26 26 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/22 4:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss [Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] . . Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Fri 03/22 4:33 PM
AFFIRMATION of Adam G. Guttell in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss [Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] .. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh D - Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff in Plaintiff's third litigation against Glenwood,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh E - Plaintiff Complaint filed by Plaintiff in Plaintiff's fourth litigation against Glenwood
24 24 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Fri 03/22 4:13 PM
AFFIRMATION of Adam G. Guttell in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss [Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] .. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Plaintiff's Summons with Notice (Complaint) filed by Plaintiff in current litigation,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff in Plaintiff's first litigation against Glenwood,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C - Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff in Plaintiff's second litigation against Glenwood
23 23 motion Dismiss Fri 03/22 3:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss [Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] . Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Thu 03/07 2:17 PM
LETTER from C. Currin, dated 3/6/24 re: I AM STILL WAITING FOR THE TWO BEDROOM APARTMENT FOR ME AND A FULL TIME LIVE-IN NURSE THAT I QUALIFIED FOR AND HAVE BEEN PROMISED NOW FOR TEN YEARS. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/05 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, including the referral to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses for General Pretrial (including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motions (i.e., motions requiring a Report and Recommendation).All parties must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules & Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-margaret-m-garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 3/5/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/22 3:55 PM
ORDER: For the reasons discussed during today's pre-motion conference, defendants' time to file their answer or other responding pleading is EXTENDED to March 22, 2024. If defendants file a motion, it shall be limited to the issues raised in their January 17, 2024 letter. (Dkt. 12.) If plaintiff believes a further (brief) extension of the March 22 deadline would be appropriate in light of his efforts to retain counsel to represent him in this matter, he may make that request by letter, in which he must also update the Court on the progress of his retention efforts. SO ORDERED. Glenwood Management Corp. answer due 3/22/2024; Carole Pittelman answer due 3/22/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/22/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 02/22 10:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/22/2024. (tk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 02/22 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge John P. Cronan is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Tue 02/20 2:18 PM
LETTER from C. Currin, dated 2/16/24 re: www.GlenwoodManagementCorp.com - The website is complete that details everything I have been through the past ten years, and I hope none of you have to endure what I have. If only Glenwood had done what they qualified me for and promised. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Tue 02/20 8:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from C. Currin, dated 2/15/24 re: A dear friend from my "Prevention of Cruelty to Animals' Charity is helping me put together a simple website which includes all information about my desperate ten-year plight, asking Glenwood Management Corp to do what they qualified me for and promised me now for ten years. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(sc)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/15 1:06 PM
ORDER: The Court's Order dated January 25, 2024 (Dkt. 13) deferred ruling on defendants' request for a pre-motion conference with respect to their (i) anticipated motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint, and (ii) request that the Court enjoin plaintiff from pursuing duplicative lawsuits against them pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1651, pending receipt of the parties' 2023 settlement agreement. See id. at 3. In light of defendants' filing of that agreement (Dkt. 14), the Court will hold a pre-motion conference on February 22, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY, 10007. This is an in-person proceeding. Any requests for accommodations must be made, in writing, no later than February 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/15/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
16 16 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 02/14 12:10 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Charlie Currin consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(sc) (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/14/2024) Errata Attachment
15 15 misc Letter Wed 02/14 12:04 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from C. Currin, dated 2/13/24 re: Ten long years of Shameful Cruelty to a Disabled-Handicapped Tenant by Glenwood Management Corp. and Glenwood Assisted Housing etc. I have been begging for my apartment to be made handicapped accessible even after U.S. Attorney Bharara sued Glenwood management Corp. Document filed by Charlie Currin.(sc) (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/14/2024) Exhibit 1
Monday, January 29, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 01/29 3:16 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 13. Mailed to: Charlie Currin 175 West 60th Street Apt. 30F New York, NY 10023. (mt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
14 14 misc Settlement Agreement Fri 01/26 2:28 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT . Document filed by Carole Pittelman, Glenwood Management Corp., Charlie Currin.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:13 .(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Thu 01/25 2:26 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Conference re:12 LETTER MOTION for Conference Related [+] addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Adam G. Guttell, Esq. dated January 17, 2024. The above-referenced action has been removed from state court and referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, and for report and recommendation on dispositive motions, if any, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. Information for the Pro Se. The Court defers ruling on defendants' request for a pre-motion conference pending the receipt of the 2023 settlement agreement. Defendant shall promptly file that agreement, including any exhibits or attachments, under seal, at the "selected parties" level. The letter-motion is GRANTED to the extent that defendants' time to answer or move with respect to the Summons with Notice is EXTENDED until February 26, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the letter-motion at Dkt. 12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/25/2024) (rro)
Related: [-] quest for Pre-Motion Conference
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/25 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Glenwood Management Corp. answer due 2/26/2024; Carole Pittelman answer due 2/26/2024. (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 01/19 10:56 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 10. Mailed to: Charlie Currin 175 West 60th Street Apt. 30F New York, NY 10023. (mt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
12 12 motion Conference Wed 01/17 3:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference Related [+] addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Adam G. Guttell, Esq. dated January 17, 2024. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-] quest for Pre-Motion Conference
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenna Eurell on behalf of Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Eurell, Jenna)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 01/16 2:44 PM
***Deleted docket entry - NOTICE OF REFERRAL of ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/12 4:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/12/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 01/11 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Granek Guttell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 01/11 11:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/11 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/11 11:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 01/10 3:21 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-5424. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 01/10 3:19 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-5291. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 01/10 3:18 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-5289. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 01/10 3:17 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-10763. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 01/10 3:16 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-6047. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp., Carole Pittelman..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/10 3:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Glenwood Management Corp...(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/10 3:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/10 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 101310/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28793288).Document filed by Carole Pittelman, Glenwood Management Corp...(Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons with Notice)