Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-20098
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
MVHF Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Cecilia Sofia Miranda
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo
Represented By
Cecilia Sofia Miranda
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
John W. Thornton
Plaintiff
Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.
Represented By
Michael R. Gray
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Michael D Joblove
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 05/29 10:19 AM
ORDER that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (wc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
34 34 1 pgs misc Form AO 120/121 Fri 03/08 10:05 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Order Administratively Closing Case
33 33 order Administrative Order Fri 03/08 9:45 AM
Administrative Order Closing Case. Denying as moot19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendant's MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS filed by MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
32 32 4 pgs notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 03/07 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 02/23 3:31 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before the Honorable John W. Thornton; Mediation Hearing set for 3/4/2024 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/23 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
29 29 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 4:18 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/13 11:26 AM
ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 2/10/2025 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 2/4/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 3/26/2024. All discovery, including expert discovery, due by 10/15/2024. Mediation Deadline 4/19/2024. Motions due by 10/29/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/26/2024. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/13 10:36 AM
ORDER re12 Order Requiring Certificates of Interested Parties; the parties shall comply with the January 18, 2024 Order by 2/14/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 10:34 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo identifying Other Affiliate Tim Brueggemann for MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo (Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 02/13 8:35 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. Tim Brueggemann (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
24 24 2 pgs misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/12 4:26 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo (Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 02/12 2:35 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/09 6:28 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendant's MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS filed by MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. (Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/02 3:29 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendant's MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS filed by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. Replies due by 2/9/2024. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Expedited Motion Thu 01/25 3:42 PM
ORDER denying16 Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
19 19 motion Compel Stay Wed 01/24 6:04 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration ( Responses due by 2/7/2024.), Defendant's MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS by MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo.(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/24 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cecilia Sofia Miranda on behalf of MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. Attorney Cecilia Sofia Miranda added to party MVHF Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cecilia Sofia Miranda added to party Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo(pty:dft). (Miranda, Cecilia)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/24 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandro Brito on behalf of MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. Attorney Alejandro Brito added to party MVHF Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alejandro Brito added to party Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo(pty:dft). (Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
16 16 motion Expedited Motion Tue 01/23 1:19 PM
Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 01/22 11:41 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
14 14 motion File Excess Pages Fri 01/19 3:38 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Answer Thu 01/18 3:09 PM
ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by February 1, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 01/18 3:08 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 2/12/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 01/18 2:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. MVHF Enterprises, Inc. served on 1/11/2024, response/answer due 2/1/2024. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 01/18 2:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo served on 1/11/2024, response/answer due 2/1/2024. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/12 9:30 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael R. Gray, Esq. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 01/11 4:32 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael R. Gray. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17207684 by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc.. Responses due by 1/25/2024.(Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 misc Bar Letter Thu 01/11 1:14 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael R. Gray, mailing date January 11, 2024, (pt)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/11 11:58 AM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc. (Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/11 11:21 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's counsel, Michael R. Gray shall file a motion to appear pro hac vice by January 17, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/11 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. (nwn)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 01/11 9:11 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (nwn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint & Exhibits
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/11 9:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/10 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT (Verified) against MVHF Enterprises, Inc., Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17204296, filed by Woof Gang Bakery, Inc..(Joblove, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 12 2 pgs Summon(s) - MVHF Enterprises,
Att: 13 Summon(s) - Marjolijn van Hoorn Fajardo