New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-bk-10039
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 14, 2025
Claims Deadline:Sep 09, 2024

Debtor
Schiff Fine Art, LLC
249 1/2 E 13th St
New York, NY 10003-5602
Represented By
John R Cahill
Artxlaw PLLC
contact info
Eric J. Snyder
Wilk Auslander LLP
contact info
Randy Zelin
Randy Scott Zelin PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Candace Barasch
1185 Park Avenue, Apt. 12A
New York, NY 10128
Represented By
Eric H. Horn
A.Y. Strauss
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Adam Sheffer
37 West 12th Street, 10C
New York, NY 10011
Petitioning Creditor
Lauren Schor
154 East 78th Street
New York, NY 10075
Petitioning Creditor
Richard Grossman
37 West 12th Street #10 C
New York, NY 10011
Trustee
Deborah Piazza
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP 1350 Broadway 11th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Scott S. Markowitz
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Eric Zabicki
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Deborah Piazza
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Jill L. Makower
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Michael Z. Brownstein
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Douglas J. Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004

GPO Mar 12 2024
Decision and Order Signed on 3/12/2024 Granting Motion to Intervene, Denying Motion to Dismiss and Reserving Decision on Motion to Abstain. (related document(s)10, 8) (Calderon, Lynda)

Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 4:56 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 01/10 3:15 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10039 ) [misc,826] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16475724. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Wed 01/10 3:40 PM
Judge David S Jones added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Related Wed 01/10 3:44 PM
Case Related to: Case Number: 24-10010 Lisa Schiff (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Judge David S Jones added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Case Related to: Case Number: 24-10010 Lisa Schiff (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Involuntary Petition Chapter 7 (Fee) Wed 01/10 3:14 PM
Involuntary Petition Against A Non-Individual (Chapter 7) Involuntary Chapter 7 Petition Against Schiff Fine Art, LLC (Fee Amount $ 338.) Against: Schiff Fine Art, LLC. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Candace Barasch, Adam Sheffer, Lauren Schor. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter Wed 01/10 3:30 PM
Letter Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Eric H. Horn on behalf of Candace Barasch. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]