Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 11, 2024 2:24 AM EST
Defendant
Wesley Wood (1)
Represented By
David R. Bungard
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Owen A. Reynolds
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/18/2025 11:39 AM EDT
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
CASE as to Wesley Wood assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Wesley Wood count 1. (tmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT - Unredacted Copy for Court Users Only as to Wesley Wood. (tmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER as to Wesley Wood; directing that the initial appearance and arraignment of defendant shall take place on 1/23/2024 at 10:45 AM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/9/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft, CJA Attorney Advisor) (skm)
Related: [-]