California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00161
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Richard Paquette
427 West 5th Street, Unit 2214
Los Angeles, CA 90013
Plaintiff
437 Hill Highrise, LLC
Represented By
Chris J. Evans
Kimball Tirey And St. John LLP
contact info
Chris J Evans
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 25, 2024
9 9 misc Receipt Thu 01/25 4:54 PM
Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 1/18/2024. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 01/12 8:45 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 23STUD10161. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 01/12 8:43 AM
ORDER SUA SPONTE REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court REMANDS this action to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, Case No. 23STUD10161. The Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED as moot3 . All dates and deadlines are vacated. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 01/10 1:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/10 1:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/10 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 01/10 1:07 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Richard Paquette. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/10 1:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Richard Paquette. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/10 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, filed by Defendant Richard Paquette. Case number 23STUD10161 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II, Discovery to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CV71