Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:24-cv-00049
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
The Lewin Group Inc
Defendant
Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc
Defendant
Optuminsight Inc
Defendant
OptumRx Inc
Represented By
Brian D Boone
Alston & Bird Llp (nc)
contact info
Shannon L McDougald
Mcdougald Law Group P.S. (mercer Island)
contact info
Caroline Rawls Strumph
Alston & Bird Llp (ga)
contact info
Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Alston & Bird Llp (la)
contact info
Defendant
Optum Inc
Defendant
Medco Health Solutions Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Ingenix Pharmaceutical Services Inc
Defendant
Ingenix Inc
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Administrators LLC
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
ESI Mail Order Processing Inc
Represented By
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Danielle L Gilmore
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Jonathan G Cooper
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Michael Lyle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (los Angeles)
contact info
Christopher Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Merck-Medco
Plaintiff
King County
Represented By
Janine Joly
contact info
Matthew Melamed
Keller Rohrback Llp (ca)
contact info
Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Matthew M. Gerend
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Devon Shannon
contact info
Alison Gaffney
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Andrew Lindsay
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Kylie Fisher
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Dean N Kawamoto
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Derek W Loeser
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
David J Ko
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
95 95 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 2:01 PM
ORDER re92 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kiel Ireland for Defendants Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Inc, ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
94 94 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 04/28 2:00 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/10/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/17/2025, Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2025. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
93 93 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nolan Anderson on behalf of Defendants Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Inc, ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc. (Anderson, Nolan)
Related: [-]