Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00045
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Michelle Henry
Represented By
Nicole R DiTomo
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Jacob Frasch
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Nicole R DiTomo
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Jacob Frasch
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Pilchesky
3714 Birney Ave, First Floor
Moosic, PA 18507


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility ADI Receipt Entry Mon 04/28 1:31 PM
Receipt of payment from DPAM324CV000045 in the amount of $605.00 for Notice of Appeal/Docketing Fee. Transaction posted on 4/25/2025. Receipt number 333114666 processed by CP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 04/25 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRO SE NON-PRISONER Case as to23 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Joseph Pilchesky. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 605 Receipt Number: 333114666 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Fee
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 4/21/25 (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
26 26 misc Praecipe (If Document is to Issue a Writ - Use Events Listed Below) Fri 04/18 4:41 PM
Praecipe to Attach Missing Exhibit A and B to25 Motion for Reconsideration.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 motion Reconsideration Thu 04/17 10:03 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re23 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Report and Recommendations by Joseph Pilchesky.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Mon 03/31 10:44 AM
REPLY by Joseph Pilchesky to22 Response. (dj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 03/28 9:00 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying15 Motion to Strike ; denying19 Motion ; adopting20 Report and Recommendations. The report and recommendation of Judge Arbuckle (Doc. 20) is ADOPTED;2.The defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 9) is GRANTED insofar as it requests dismissal of the plaintiffs equal protection claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under the Rooker-Feldman doctrine;3.The plaintiffs pro se complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedurethe plaintiffs equal protection claim is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under the Rooker-Feldman doctrine on the motion of the defendants, and his First Amendment claim is dismissed sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the plaintiff lacks Article III standing.4.The plaintiffs pro se motion to strike the defendants reply brief (Doc. 15) and the plaintiffs pro se motion for finality (Doc. 19) are DENIED; and5. The clerk shall mark this case as CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 3/28/25 (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 03/18 4:40 PM
RESPONSE by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania to21 Objection to Report and Recommendations . (Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
21 21 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 03/11 4:21 PM
OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations. (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 02/21 2:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania,15 MOTION to Strike14 Defendants' Reply Brief, and19 MOTION for finality and disposition of Pltf's Complaint in Declaratory Judgment that was filed on January 10, 2025 filed by Joseph Pilchesky - it is RECOMMENDED that: (1) Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants' reply brief (Doc. 15) be DENIED. (2) Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice due to lack of subject-matter jurisdiction as follows: Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 9) be GRANTED insofar as it requests dismissal of Plaintiff's equal protection claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under Rooker-Feldman. Plaintiff's First Amendment claim be dismissed sua sponte due to lack of Article III standing. (3) Plaintiff's motion for finality (Doc. 19) be DENIED. (4) The Clerk of Court be instructed to CLOSE this case. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 2/21/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/19 4:59 PM
MOTION for finality and disposition of Pltf's Complaint in Declaratory Judgment that was filed on January 10, 2025 by Joseph Pilchesky.(ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 09/03 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Pilchesky (ep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/28 10:05 AM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr for all further proceedings. (cd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
17 17 respm Reply Brief Mon 05/13 3:24 PM
REPLY BRIEF re15 MOTION to Strike14 Reply Brief filed by Joseph Pilchesky.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/30 3:37 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re15 MOTION to Strike14 Reply Brief filed by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unpublished Opinion(s)
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
15 15 motion Strike Tue 04/16 4:48 PM
MOTION to Strike14 Reply Brief by Joseph Pilchesky.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinions,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
14 14 respm Reply Brief Tue 04/09 9:12 AM
REPLY BRIEF re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Friday, April 05, 2024
13 13 misc Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 04/05 2:39 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Nicole R DiTomo terminated on behalf of Defendants Michelle Henry and The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania. (DiTomo, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 04/02 11:02 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Pilchesky.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - St. Thomas-St. John Hotel v. Govern. of US VI,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Great WEstern Mining & Mineral Co. v. Fox Rothschild, LLP,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - The Constitutional Question
Monday, March 25, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 10:55 AM
BRIEFING ORDER re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff will file a brief in opposition to Defendants' motion on or before 4/2/2024. Plaintiff is also advised that failure to file a brief in opposition may result in Defendants' motion being deemed unopposed, or the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/25/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 03/19 4:16 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/19 4:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 14, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Thu 03/14 5:19 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Wed 02/28 10:22 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/29/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 02/23 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole R DiTomo on behalf of Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania. (DiTomo, Nicole)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/23 4:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania, Michelle Henry. The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania waiver sent on 1/19/2024, answer due 3/19/2024; Michelle Henry waiver sent on 1/19/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 02/23 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Frasch on behalf of Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania. (Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Fri 01/12 1:30 PM
Receipt of payment from DPAM324CV000045 in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 1/11/2024. Receipt number 333107960 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/11 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania and provided TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Thu 01/11 10:42 AM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (nr) ( #1 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules) (nr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received (Receipt) Thu 01/11 10:40 AM
Filing Fee Receipt: $ 405, receipt number 333107960. (nr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Michelle Henry, The Office of the Attorney General of Pennsylvania ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number 333107960), filed by Joseph Pilchesky.(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 12/6/2016, PA Superior Court interpretation of intent and meaning of 42 Pa. C.S.A 2524(a),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plt 8/5/2022 Petition for HC filed in Lackawanna County at 2013 CR 1075,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Commonwealth's Response to Plt Petition for HC,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Trial Court's Rule of Crim. Procedure 904 - Notice to Dismiss Plt Petition for HC,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Plt's Objections to Trial Court's Rule 907 - Notice to Dismiss Petition for HC,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Trial Court's Order that dismissed Plt's Petition for HC,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet