Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:24-cv-00028
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Whitesell
Dla Piper, Llp (us)
contact info
Robert Buergi
contact info
Claire Schuster
contact info
Henry R. Fildes
contact info
Catherine Huang
contact info
Jennifer L. Nall
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Shuzo Maruyama
contact info
Jessica Hannah
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Angela Whitesell
Dla Piper, Llp (us)
contact info
Robert Buergi
contact info
Claire Schuster
contact info
Henry R. Fildes
contact info
Catherine Huang
contact info
Jennifer L. Nall
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Shuzo Maruyama
contact info
Jessica Hannah
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Whitesell
Dla Piper, Llp (us)
contact info
Robert Buergi
contact info
Claire Schuster
contact info
Henry R. Fildes
contact info
Catherine Huang
contact info
Jennifer L. Nall
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Shuzo Maruyama
contact info
Jessica Hannah
contact info
Defendant
Twitch Interactive, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Whitesell
Dla Piper, Llp (us)
contact info
Robert Buergi
contact info
Claire Schuster
contact info
Henry R. Fildes
contact info
Catherine Huang
contact info
Jennifer L. Nall
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Shuzo Maruyama
contact info
Jessica Hannah
contact info
Plaintiff
NL Giken Inc.
Represented By
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Aya Cieslak-Tochigi
contact info
Alexis Stombaugh
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Arden E. Bonzo
contact info
Adam Wyatt Poff
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Hunter D. Keeton
contact info
Michael A. Albert
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
105 105 misc Letter Wed 04/30 12:22 PM
Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Jeff Castellano regarding Request for Oral Argument - re85 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. (Castellano, Jeff) Modified on 4/30/2025 (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
104 104 misc Letter Tue 04/29 4:57 PM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Adam W. Poff regarding Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel - re101 Letter,.(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, April 28, 2025
103 103 discov Notice of Service Mon 04/28 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions and Defendants' Final Non-Infringement Contentions filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Twitch Interactive, Inc..(Castellano, Jeff)
Related: [-]
102 102 respm Brief - Reply Mon 04/28 3:41 PM
REPLY BRIEF re85 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Castellano, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 04/25 4:17 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Saulnier for Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., and Twitch Interactive, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
101 101 misc Letter Thu 04/24 4:37 PM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Jeff Castellano regarding Defendant' Letter Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel - re 95 Oral Order,,,,,,.(Castellano, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order