Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Julia E Kobick
Case #: 1:24-cv-10097
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Consolidated Defendant
Fallon Ambulance Service
Consolidated Defendant
Transformative Healthcare, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff
Joseph Biron
Represented By
Robert J. Maselek, Jr.
Mcdonough Cohen & Maselek LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Brevan D'Angelo, MA
Represented By
Amber Love Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Edward F. Haber
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Ian J. McLoughlin
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Daniel Durgin
Represented By
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office, LLP
contact info
Gary E. Mason
Mason LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Joseph Hall
Represented By
Amber Love Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Steven M. Nathan
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Edward F. Haber
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Ian J. McLoughlin
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
James J. Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Sarah Haskins
Represented By
James J. Reardon
Reardon Scanlon LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Michael Jacobson
Represented By
Zachary Arbitman
Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. Ryan
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Robyn Sharpe
Represented By
Raymond E. Dinsmore, III
Hayber, Mckenna & Dinsmore, LLC
contact info
Brian C Gudmundson
Zimmerman Reed, LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Anthony Viola
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Ryan
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Bart David Cohen
Bailey & Glasser Llp (pa-Na)
contact info
Defendant
Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC
Represented By
Joshua P. Dunn
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Hicks
Represented By
Randi A. Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman
contact info
David K. Lietz
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/16 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Lietz, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Arbitman on behalf of Michael Jacobson (Arbitman, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
16 16 18 pgs order Order Fri 04/12 12:17 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER entered. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court Thu 03/28 8:06 PM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC. Document received: [Proposed] Confidentiality Agreement and Order. (Dunn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 03/11 12:53 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David K. Lietz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 12:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David K. Lietz Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10310974 by Raymond Hicks.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, March 08, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order Fri 03/08 3:25 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS entered. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 03/08 3:24 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/01 4:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Raymond Hicks.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 03/01 4:09 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions by Raymond Hicks.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/21 10:19 AM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint - Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC answer due 3/29/2024. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/21 10:01 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC.(Dunn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 9:57 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC. (Dunn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Dunn on behalf of Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC (Dunn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/11 3:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 01/11 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Coastal Medical Transportation Systems, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10215363 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raymond Hicks.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons