New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:24-cv-00231
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Julio Martin Herrera Velutini
Plaintiff
Walden Macht & Haran LLP
Represented By
Jeffrey Adam Udell
Walden Macht Haran & Williams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
24 24 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 08/14 2:54 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:23 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Walden Macht & Haran LLP against Julio Martin Herrera Velutini. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated August 13, 2024, plaintiff's motion for a default judgment is granted. Plaintiff is awarded $495,847.70 and is entitled to post-judgment interest under 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court - Acting Daniel Ortiz on 8/14/2024) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Rejection of Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation Wed 08/14 11:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 54.1: Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Udell, document 20 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation, was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason: final judgment has not been entered in the case.The filer must wait until final judgment is entered. Please refile the Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation within 30 days of entry of final judgment. (nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 08/13 6:07 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for a default judgment is granted. Plaintiff is awarded $495,847.70 and is entitled to post-judgment interest under 28 U.S.C. § 1961. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully instructed to enter judgment for the plaintiff in accordance with this opinion and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/13/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
22 22 misc Proposed Default Judgment Mon 08/12 2:42 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/12/2024 (tp)
Related: [-]
21 21 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 08/12 2:38 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Udell in Support re:20 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation,. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PJI Calculation
20 20 misc Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation Mon 08/12 2:30 PM
BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against Julio Martin Herrera Velutini. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 8/26/2024.(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Invoices
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order Mon 08/12 3:29 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Udell to RE: Document No. 22 Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no Motion or Order to Show Cause for default has been filed Related [+]. (tp)
Related: [-] fer to ECF Rule 16.2 and 16.3
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/29 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
18 18 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 05/31 6:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration of Jeffrey A. Udell and Exhibits served on Julio Martin Herrera Velutini on May 31, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 05/31 5:57 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Udell . Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redacted Emails,
Att: 2 Exhibit Interest Calculation
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
16 16 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Tue 05/28 3:55 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to defendant Julio Martin Herrera Velutini. (tp)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Tue 05/28 2:54 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Udell in Support. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/28 2:49 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Tue 05/28 12:08 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Complaints Thu 05/02 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Julio Martin Herrera Velutini served on 5/1/2024, answer due 5/22/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Serve Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting7 Motion to Serve. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for alternative service is granted. Plaintiff is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to defendant's address in the United Kingdom with proof of delivery. Defendant is cautioned that he faces the possibility of having a certificate of default and a default judgment entered against him if he fails to answer the complaint within 21 days of the entry of this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully instructed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/26/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Wed 04/10 11:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeffrey A. Udell dated April 10, 2024 re: Motion to Serve Via Alternate Service. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 04/10 10:55 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 MOTION to Serve Via Alternate Service . . Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 04/10 10:54 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Udell in Support re:7 MOTION to Serve Via Alternate Service .. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Herrera Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit US v Herrera Dkt 430,
Att: 3 Exhibit S. Haran to L. Sanchez [with exhibits],
Att: 4 Exhibit L. Sanchez reply to S. Haran,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notarized copy of affidavit - 05.04.2024,
Att: 6 Exhibit A. Collins Witness Statement + AC1
7 7 motion Serve Wed 04/10 10:39 PM
MOTION to Serve Via Alternate Service . Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 order Endorsed Letter Tue 03/12 6:32 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Jeffrey Adam Udellfrom Naomi Reice Buchwald, United States District Judge dated 3/12/2024 re: A review of the docket sheet in the above-captioned matter indicates that your Amended Complaint was filed on January 11, 2024, and that, as of today's date, the complaint has not been served. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides: If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court-on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff-must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. Although Rule 4(m) creates an exception for "service in a foreign country," the exception only applies where the plaintiff attempts to effect service during the 90-day period. Thus, unless you make a reasonable, good faith attempt to serve the defendant[s], this matter will be dismissed without prejudice on April 11, 2024. Very truly yours. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/12/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/12 10:02 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/12 9:04 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julio Martin Herrera Velutini. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 01/12 8:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Udell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $419792000; County code Nassau. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 420,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/12 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Udell to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 01/12 9:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 01/12 9:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/12 9:00 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/11 1:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julio Martin Herrera Velutini, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/11 1:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Julio Martin Herrera Velutini. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28799582)Document filed by Walden Macht & Haran LLP..(Udell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]