Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:24-cv-00035
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Clayton Fire House
Defendant
Clayton Police Department
Defendant
LifeHouse Church
Defendant
Middletown Police Department
Plaintiff
Renee A. Chrustowski
711 Wood Duck Ct.
Middletown, DE 19709

GPO Feb 18 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/18/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 2/18/2025*** (mws)

Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/29 4:24 PM
ORDER denying16 MOTION to Amend (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/29/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Thu 02/27 4:26 PM
MOTION to Amend D.I.1 Complaint (Pro Se) - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/18 9:06 AM
ORDER: The Complaint (D.I. 1) is DISMISSED. Plaintiff's pending motions (D.I. 9; D.I. 10; D.I. 11) are DISMISSED as moot. Plaintiff is given leave to amend the Complaint (D.I. 1). The amended complaint shall be filed on or before March 21, 2025. Set Deadlines: (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/21/2025.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/18/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 2/18/2025*** (mws)
Related: [-]
14 14 6 pgs order Opinion - Memorandum Opinion Tue 02/18 9:05 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/18/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 2/18/2025*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Tue 12/31 8:23 AM
OPENING BRIEF in Support of11 MOTION for Ex Parte Communication with Judge, Jury, and Agencies,10 MOTION to Compel,12 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/13/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Tue 12/31 8:04 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/30 4:18 PM
MOTION for Ex Parte Communication with Judge, Jury, and Agencies - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
10 10 motion Compel Mon 12/30 4:06 PM
MOTION to Compel - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 appeal USCA Order Terminating Appeal Thu 08/01 10:55 AM
USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to7 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. USCA Decision: Dismissed for lack of appellate jurisdiction. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
8 8 appeal - - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit Tue 03/12 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re7 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. USCA Case Number 24-1401 USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 appeal - NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit Tue 03/05 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit. Appeal filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. TPO mailed to Plaintiff(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/13 11:15 AM
ORDER granting D.I.5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/13/2024. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/09 9:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
utility Remark Wed 02/07 9:48 AM
Remark: Copy of D.I.3 re-mailed to Prose Plaintiff. (jfm)
Related: [-]
misc PLRA or Non Prisoner 285's Received Thu 02/08 9:29 AM
USM 285 forms received for the following defendants: LifeHouse Church. USM forms placed in the case jacket. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 misc Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 01/23 10:10 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of D.I.2 Magistrate Consent Forms. Acknowledgment filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. (mkr)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order - Non-Prisoner Pro Se IFP-Deficiency Mon 01/22 2:29 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application or pay in full the $405.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/12/2024. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/22/2024. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Long Form Application
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/17 2:44 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00035-CFC, 1:24-cv-00036-CFC, 1:24-cv-00037-CFC, 1:24-cv-00038-CFC (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 01/11 4:17 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Non-Prisoner Thu 01/11 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Clayton Fire House, Clayton Police Department, LifeHouse Church, Middletown Police Department (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski. (vfm)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 01/11 4:21 PM
Remark: Pro-Se Privacy Notice, Magistrate Consent Form, and Receipt of Magistrate Consent Form have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (vfm)
Related: [-]