Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:24-cv-10099
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
TD Bank, NA
Represented By
Francis J. Bingham
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Alexa Marie Esposito
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Marini
Represented By
Benjamin J. Wyatt
The Law Offices Of Wyatt & Associates
contact info
Michael Varraso
Law Offices Of Wyatt & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
24 24 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 5:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Alexa M. Esposito in Opposition re19 MOTION to Compel Further Reasonable Searches for Electronically Stored Information filed by TD Bank, NA.(Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 5:46 PM
Opposition re19 MOTION to Compel Further Reasonable Searches for Electronically Stored Information filed by TD Bank, NA. (Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/15 7:45 AM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time until May 2, 2025 to File Opposition to Motion to Compel. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/14 4:46 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 2, 2025 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Compel Further Reasonable Searches for Electronically Stored Information by TD Bank, NA.(Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 04/04 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION to Compel Further Reasonable Searches for Electronically Stored Information filed by Joseph Marini. (Varraso, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Compel Fri 04/04 2:39 PM
MOTION to Compel Further Reasonable Searches for Electronically Stored Information by Joseph Marini.(Varraso, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michael Varraso
Monday, January 27, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Reassignment Mon 01/27 12:02 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy added. Judge Allison D. Burroughs no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/20 8:34 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 Motion for Extension of time/modifying scheduling order deadlines. Status Conference set for 5/28/2025 09:15 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/19 1:00 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to /Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines by TD Bank, NA.(Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 12/18 2:45 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING14 Motion for Protective Order. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Protective Order Wed 12/18 10:06 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by TD Bank, NA.(Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alice A. Kokodis on behalf of TD Bank, NA (Kokodis, Alice)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 11/22 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Francis J. Bingham (Bingham, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/17 9:47 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TD Bank, NA. (Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/29 9:35 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING9 Joint Proposed Schedule. Status Conference set for 1/23/2025 09:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 misc Joint statement of counsel Fri 04/26 3:52 PM
JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Varraso, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
8 8 order Order Fri 04/12 9:37 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule by 4/26/24 and indicate whether they object to the court setting a schedule on the written submission. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Bingham on behalf of TD Bank, NA (Bingham, Francis)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/04 4:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by TD Bank, NA.(Esposito, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/27 9:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Marini. TD Bank, NA waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Varraso, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/12 10:18 AM
Summons Issued as to TD Bank, NA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 01/12 9:56 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wyatt on behalf of Joseph Marini (Wyatt, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against TD Bank, NA Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10215993 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Marini.(Varraso, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet