Rhode Island District Court
Judge:William E Smith
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00020
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Dorman's Auto Center, Inc., RI
Plaintiff
BASF Corporation, NJ
Represented By
Stephen Adams
Barton Gilman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 01, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 4:04 PM
NOTICE by BASF Corporation of Dismissal (Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
order Order Tue 03/05 1:31 PM
TEXT ORDER entering7 Stipulation. Dorman's Auto Center, Inc. answer due 3/4/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/5/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 02/28 10:58 AM
STIPULATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 02/09 10:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by BASF Corporation for Complaint BASF Corporation served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/24 1:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Dorman's Auto Center, Inc. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Request Wed 01/24 12:36 PM
Summons Request filed by BASF Corporation. (Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/24 11:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BASF Corporation for BASF Corporation.. (Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Thu 01/11 5:04 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 01/11 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1951942 ), filed by BASF Corporation.(Adams, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/11 5:03 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]