Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-00059
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
FBI Agent Moore
Defendant
James Edwin Haley
Defendant
Larry Wayne Haley, Sr
Defendant
Larry Wayne Haley, Jr
Defendant
Senator John Kennedy
Defendant
Preston Kennedy
Defendant
Bernard Kerik
Defendant
Deborah Landry
Defendant
Carman Dominic Licciardello
Defendant
Neal McCauley
Defendant
David McDavid
Defendant
Becky D. McKey
Defendant
Huey Frank Haley
Defendant
FBI Agent John Moore
Defendant
Alice Sue Newman
Defendant
Bonnie Haley Noland
Defendant
Orlando Police Department
Defendant
Oxford, GA Police Department
Defendant
Renee Bickham Priest
Defendant
US Secret Service
Defendant
Debbie Westfort
Defendant
Gary Westfort
Defendant
Zachary, LA Police Department
Defendant
Estate of Morris and Geogene Jackson
Defendant
Tommy Barnett
Defendant
Pat Barthe
Defendant
TD'Dennis Bickham, III
Defendant
DVM Lisa Brabham
Defendant
Kim Mckey Byrd
Defendant
Covington, GA Police Department
Defendant
Estate of David Wilkerson
Defendant
Estate of John F. Kennedy Jr
Defendant
Estate of John F. Kennedy Sr
Defendant
Estate of Marguerite Annison
Defendant
Estate of Marie McCauley Bickham
Defendant
Estate of Senator Dianne Feinstein
Defendant
Estate of Vera McCauley Zachary
Defendant
FBI FIeld Office, Orlando, FL-2 John Doe Agents
Defendant
FBI Field Office Headquarters New York NY
Defendant
FBI Headquarters
Defendant
Bank of Zachary, LA
Defendant
First Baptist Church, Zachary, LA
Defendant
Ted Haggard
Defendant
Amber Thibodeaux Haley
Defendant
Benjamin O'Neal Haley
Plaintiff
Patty Lee Haley
P.O. Box 787
Oxford, GA 30054


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 03/05 4:16 PM
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 5 is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed 2 is DENIED. The Complaint 1 is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/5/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 order Standing Order Wed 01/17 10:46 AM
STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/19/2022. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 01/16 4:18 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is RECOMMENDED that: 1. The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as a Pauper (Doc. 2) be DENIED; 2. the Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice; and 3. the Clerk be directed to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/16/2024. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/12 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Fri 01/12 3:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/12/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/11 2:28 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Patty Lee Haley. (ARL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Patty Lee Haley.(ARL)
Related: [-]