New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-01061
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 12, 2024 2:53 AM EST
Defendant
GIOVANNI SERRANO (1)
Represented By
VINCENT C. SCOCA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MATTHEW SPECHT
Doj-Usao
contact info
RAY A. MATEO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/19/2024 1:36 PM EST
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
Arrest of GIOVANNI SERRANO (jqb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs INFORMATION as to GIOVANNI SERRANO (1) count(s) 1. (aa, ) Modified on 12/19/2023 (jqb, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by GIOVANNI SERRANO (aa, ) Modified on 12/19/2023 (jqb, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer:Initial Appearance as to GIOVANNI SERRANO held on 12/13/2023. Defendant Released. Bail Set: $100,000 unsecured appearance bond, travel restricted, PTS supervision, etc. (ECR) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: VINCENT C. SCOCA appearing for GIOVANNI SERRANO (jqb, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GIOVANNI SERRANO (1) $100,000 unsecured appearance bond, third party custodian, PTS supervision, travel restricted, mental health testing/treatment, substance abuse testing/treatment, surrender passport/travel documents, surrender/do not possess firearms, etc. (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2023. (ECR) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to GIOVANNI SERRANO in amount of $100,000. (jqb, )
Related: [-]