Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:24-cv-00068
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 4:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
One Bala Plaza Suite 100
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004
Represented By
Alexa L. Lester
Watters Wolf Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Robert L. Brady
Watters Wolf Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Benjamin Eric Niemeyer
Watters Wolf Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Woodridge Condominium Association
Represented By
Scott Hunziker
Hunziker And Barmore PLLC
contact info
Benjamin Paul Barmore
Hunziker And Barmore PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
36 36 order A Docket Text Order Wed 02/12 10:16 AM
Docket Text ORDER: In light of the Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared, Doc.35 , the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on February 12, 2025. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
35 35 misc Stipulation Tue 02/11 4:23 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Lester, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
34 34 adr Notice of Appointment of Neutral Fri 12/27 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Litz, Robert D. Neutral selected by parties. (cc: Neutral)(TMT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
33 33 adr Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report Thu 12/26 8:09 AM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association Neutral: Litz, Robert D. Date of Conference: 01/13/2025 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Zoom(Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 12/19 4:42 PM
ANSWER to31 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/13 11:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Amendment to 30 Docket Text Order, Jury Demand demand, (Third) , filed by Woodridge Condominium Association. Related document: 30 Docket Text Order,.(Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy
30 30 order A Docket Text Order Fri 12/13 11:02 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, Doc.29 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall promptly file a clean version of the Third Amended Complaint that is free of exhibit stickers and separate from any other exhibit. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/13/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
29 29 motion Leave to Wed 12/11 3:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association.(Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint
Monday, December 02, 2024
28 28 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 12/02 3:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Benjamin Paul Barmore. ADR Completion Deadline due by 2/6/2025. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 2/20/2025. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 12/26/2024. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on December 2, 2024. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
27 27 order Case Management Order Fri 04/26 11:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. ( Motion to Join Parties due by 5/24/2024. Discovery Completion due by 2/28/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2025. ADR Future Reference 12/6/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2025. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 04/26/2024. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
26 26 minutes Rule 16 Conference Thu 04/25 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp:Rule 16 Conference held on 4/25/2024. Conference held via Zoom. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 2:05 PM) (proceedings ended: 2:13 PM) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Scott Hunziker)(Appearance for Defendant: Alexa Lester) (BRP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
25 25 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Fri 04/19 11:16 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association. . (Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
24 24 order Rule 16 Order Mon 04/08 2:42 PM
RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/22/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/25/2024 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 4/8/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
23 23 motion Leave to Fri 04/05 4:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Entry of Court Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association. (Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/27 11:00 AM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 24, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 03/24 6:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Jury Demand demand, , filed by Woodridge Condominium Association.(Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
order A Docket Text Order Fri 03/22 4:37 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Doc.19 , is GRANTED. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint. In light of Plaintiff's forthcoming Second Amended Complaint, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike, Doc.17 , is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 03/22/2024. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
19 19 motion Leave to Mon 03/11 2:56 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association.(Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 02/26 2:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Alternative Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Consequential Damages Set Forth in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Mon 02/26 2:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case or Alternative Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Consequential Damages Set Forth in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/26 2:08 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/21 11:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Doc.13 ; see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Strike, Doc.5 , pertaining to the original complaint, is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/21/2024. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 02/20 2:57 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Hunziker for Plaintiff Woodridge Condominium Association. (Hunziker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/12 10:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company , filed by Woodridge Condominium Association.(Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 02/09 2:45 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Holding, Inc., Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., LTD, Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Lester, Alexa)
Related: [-]
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Fri 02/09 2:04 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
10 10 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/02 2:33 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Eric Niemeyer for Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Niemeyer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/02 2:24 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Alexa L. Lester for Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Lester, Alexa)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/02 2:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L. Brady for Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 2:02 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 02/02 2:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Consequential Damages and Attorneys Fees filed by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss (other than a party or the case) Fri 02/02 1:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Consequential Damages and Attorneys Fees by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/31 12:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Woodridge Condominium Association Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company waiver signed on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Issued Fri 01/12 11:37 AM
WAIVER of Service issued defendantPhiladelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. sent to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company on 01/12/2024 filed by Woodridge Condominium Association. Waiver of Service due by 3/12/2024. (Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 01/12 10:04 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodridge Condominium Association. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/12 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10374877, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Woodridge Condominium Association.(Barmore, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 01/12 12:38 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 1 Waiver(s) of Service issued. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]