Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-30864

North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Craig Whitley
Case #: 3:24-ap-03000
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC
Represented By
The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC
Represented By
Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Anna Cotten Wright
Grier Wright Martinez, PA 521 E Morehead Street Suite 440
Charlotte, NC 28202
Plaintiff
John Rolland Blythe
Represented By
Rashad Blossom
Blossom Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
18 18 audio Audio MP3 Mon 12/23 4:27 PM
Related: [-]
utility Close Case Mon 12/23 9:40 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (bfm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/20 1:30 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Rashad Blossom on behalf of John Rolland Blythe. (Blossom, Rashad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
court Disposition of Hearing/Trial Mon 12/09 10:03 AM
Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable Ashley Austin Edwards: CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 3) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at 3-Courtroom 2B. (adf)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Rolland Blythe
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
16 16 audio Audio MP3 Tue 11/19 2:20 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
court Disposition of Hearing/Trial Mon 11/18 1:57 PM
Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable Ashley Austin Edwards: CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 2) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-Courtroom 2B. (mdw)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Rolland Blythe
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
15 15 audio Audio MP3 Tue 09/10 2:20 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
court Disposition of Hearing/Trial Mon 09/09 11:02 AM
Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 1) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (mdw)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Rolland Blythe
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/29 11:42 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rashad Blossom on behalf of John Rolland Blythe. Hearing scheduled for 9/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Blossom, Rashad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Declaration of Plaintiff John Rolland Blythe
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
13 13 notice BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/18 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Initial Pre-Trial Order
Monday, April 15, 2024
12 12 order Initial Pre-Trial Order Mon 04/15 10:38 AM
Court Initial Pre-Trial Order Discovery due by 7/15/2024. (cet)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
11 11 answer Answer Fri 04/12 5:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Kimberly A. Sheek on behalf of Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC, The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC. (Sheek, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Rolland Blythe
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 order Extend Thu 03/14 3:50 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to File Answer by Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC Answer Due 4/12/2024 Related [+] (cet)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
7 7 motion Extend Tue 03/12 3:16 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. filed by Kimberly A. Sheek on behalf of Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC, The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC. (Sheek, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 order Extend Fri 02/09 12:52 PM
Ex Parte Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to File Answer by Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC Answer Due 3/13/2024; The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC Answer Due 3/13/2024 Related [+] (gav)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Extend Fri 02/09 9:28 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. filed by Kimberly A. Sheek on behalf of Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC, The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC. (Sheek, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Mon 01/15 11:02 AM
Summons Service Executed. Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC served on 1/14/2024. (Blossom, Rashad)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Mon 01/15 11:01 AM
Summons Service Executed. The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC served on 1/14/2024. (Blossom, Rashad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 01/12 3:55 PM
Summons Issued (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 01/11 3:20 PM
Adversary case 24-03000 Complaint 14 by John Rolland Blythe against The Connor Group, a Real Estate Investment Firm, LLC, Alcove Birkdale XIV LLC -. Pre-Trial Order due by 05/10/2024. (Blossom, Rashad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cover Sheet