Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20939

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 2:24-ap-02003
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Norris Ventures, LLC
173 Old Beaver Grade Road
Coraopolis, PA 15108
Represented By
Norris Ventures, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Schons
545 Marks Drive
Coraopolis, PA 15108
Represented By
Sy Oscar Lampl
Robert O Lampl Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosemarie Schons
545 Marks Drive
Coraopolis, PA 15108
Represented By
Sy Oscar Lampl
Robert O Lampl Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
8 8 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/09 9:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary, Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2003 Closed. (msch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :5 Order -Non-motion related-
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 order Dismissing Case or Debtor Mon 09/23 12:39 PM
Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed on 9/23/2024. Case Ready For Closing on 10/8/2024. (obro)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order -Non-motion related- Mon 09/23 12:02 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Signed on 9/23/2024. (obro)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/15 2:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Norris Ventures, LLC 1/15/2024 . (Lampl, Sy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 01/12 9:51 AM
One Summons Issued on: Norris Ventures, LLC - Date Issued 1/12/2024, Answer Due 2/12/2024. If an answer is not timely filed, Plaintiff SHALL FILE a Motion For Default Judgment on or before 2/22/2024. cm: Sy O. Lampl, Esq. (skoz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 01/11 3:20 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-02003 JAD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number B16589962, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 3:02 PM
Adversary case 24-02003 Complaint by Frank and Rosemarie Schons against Norris Ventures, LLC. Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Lampl, Sy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C