Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-00144
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Anna's Archive
Defendant
John Does 1-20
Defendant
Maria Dolores Anasztasia Matienzo
5127 S. Holly St.
Seattle, WA 98118
Represented By
Sarah Miller Benoit
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Leon David Bass
contact info
Plaintiff
OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
6565 Kilgour Pl
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
Brittany Nycole Marie Silverman
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
Jeffrey M. Walker
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Traci Lynn Martinez
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
Kathryn Meghan Brown
Squire Patton Boggs LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 22 2024
OPINION AND ORDER granting 9 Motion to Serve Defendant Annas Archive by Email. Plaintiff shall present to the Office of the Clerk summons directed to Defendant Anna's Archive at these email addresses. Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint, summons, and the other case-initiating documents upon Defendant Annas Archive. Plaintiffs counsel shall file a declaration of proof of service in lieu of a signed receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 22, 2024. (jlk) Modified text by adding Opinion to the title on 3/22/2024 (mas).

Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
54 54 7 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 4:01 PM
OPINION and ORDER - The Court CERTIFIES two questions of Ohio law to the Supreme Court of Ohio. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/16/2025. (jk)
Related: [-]