South Carolina District Court
Judge:Mary Geiger Lewis
Referred: Shiva V Hodges
Case #: 3:24-cv-00200
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:County of Richland Court of Common Pleas, 2023-CP-40-06650
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:19 AM EDT
Defendant
South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control
Represented By
Chandler Elizabeth Aragona
Burr & Forman (chas)
contact info
Richard J Morgan
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse M. Olivares
Represented By
Julius Wistar Babb, IV
Cromer Babb And Porter LLC
contact info
Nicholas Joseph Michele Quatraro
Cromer Babb And Porter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/10 1:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control. (Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 09/30 10:26 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 First Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 09/30/2024. (cpri)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/30 10:25 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/11/2024, Motions due by 1/9/2025 and Mediation Due by 1/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 09/30/2024. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Thu 09/26 3:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct20 Scheduling Order by Jesse M. Olivares. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Babb, Julius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 16, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/16 1:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/16/24. (vhor)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/16 1:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Jesse M. Olivares. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Quatraro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 07/25 9:13 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order as addressed in 19 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 07/25/2024. (cpri)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/25 9:11 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/12/2024, Motions due by 10/27/2024, Mediation Due by 12/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 07/25/2024. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Wed 07/24 1:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Scheduling Order, by Jesse M. Olivares. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Quatraro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
18 18 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Fri 06/14 4:16 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Jesse M. Olivares.(Quatraro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Affidavit of Records Custodian Fri 06/14 4:13 PM
Plaintiff's AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Plaintiff's by Jesse M. Olivares.(Quatraro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
16 16 discov Affidavit of Records Custodian Fri 06/07 3:43 PM
Defendant's AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Defendant's by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Fri 06/07 3:42 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Wed 05/08 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Chandler Elizabeth Aragona for June 20, 2024 through June 28, 2024 (Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
13 13 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Wed 02/21 12:41 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/21/2024. (lbak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
12 12 motion Confidentiality Order Tue 02/20 3:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control. Response to Motion due by 3/5/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Confidentiality Order
11 11 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 02/20 3:49 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Tue 02/20 3:46 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/20 3:44 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Aragona, Chandler)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/20 3:14 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jesse M. Olivares.(Babb, Julius)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 02/13 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Richard J Morgan for July 11 - August 13, 2024 (Morgan, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 01/25 2:39 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jesse M. Olivares.(Babb, Julius)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 12:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 2/20/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/15/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/14/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/14/2024, Discovery due by 8/13/2024, Motions due by 8/28/2024, ADR Statement due by 9/28/2024, Mediation Due by 10/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/16/2024. (lbak)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control.(Morgan, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 01/12 11:57 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control. (lbak)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 01/12 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Richland Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP 40-06650 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC - 11525308), filed by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control. (lbak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings