Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Patrick R Wyrick
Case #: 5:24-cv-00039
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 4:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Camino Natural Resources LLC
Plaintiff
Monarch Minerals LLC
Represented By
Hammons P Hepner
Sharp Law, LLP
contact info
Rex A Sharp
Sharp Law, LLP
contact info
Scott B Goodger
Sharp Law Llp - Prairie Village
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/12 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Monarch Minerals LLC(on behalf of itself), Monarch Minerals LLC(on behalf of all others similarly situated,) (Sharp, Rex)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/12 10:44 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Camino Natural Resources LLC. (kb)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/12 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Camino Natural Resources LLC filed by Monarch Minerals LLC(on behalf of itself), Monarch Minerals LLC(on behalf of all others similarly situated,).(kb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Oil and Gas Lease,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Fri 01/12 11:11 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4334189. (Sharp, Rex)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 01/12 4:07 PM
Docket Annotation: Civil Case Terminated (see Voluntary Dismissal3 , filed 1/12/2024). (ks)
Related: [-]