Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10135

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:24-ap-01001
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Roth Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Roth Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH V. WOMACK, Joseph V. Womack as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of Meadow Lark Agency, Inc.
Womack & Associates, LLC P. O. Box 81065
Billings, MT 59108
Represented By
TRENT M. GARDNER
Goetz, Geddes & Gardner, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Fri 01/10 11:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Wed 01/08 11:37 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 1/8/2025 Related [+]. STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2601 2ND AVE NORTH, BILLINGS, MT . (AEB)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH V. WOMACK
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
9 9 audio Digital Audio Tue 01/07 12:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/7/2025 9:02:52 AM ]. File Size [ 2968 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:11 ]. (AdminMontana)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Minutes of Hearing Held Tue 01/07 10:44 AM
Minutes of Hearing Held; Status Conference will be continued. Appearances by: Daniel Morgan, Trent Gardner and Christy Brandon. Hearing commenced at 09:02 and concluded at 09:09 Related [+]. (SMC)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH V. WOMACK,6 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Thu 12/05 10:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Tue 12/03 4:48 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Signed on 12/3/2024 Related [+]. STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 09:00 AM at 2601 2ND AVE NORTH, BILLINGS, MT . (KAH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH V. WOMACK
Monday, January 29, 2024
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 01/29 3:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by DANIEL S MORGAN Filed by on behalf of Amanda R Roth. (MORGAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice - ADV Thu 01/18 3:03 PM
Notice of Filing Lis Pendens Filed by JOSEPH V. WOMACK.(GARDNER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Lis Pendens
Thursday, January 11, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 01/11 2:33 PM
Summons Issued on Roth Enterprises, LLC Date Issued 1/11/2024, Answer Due 2/12/2024. (CEH)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/11 1:34 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number A2997470 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint([LINK:1:24-ap-01001-BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/11 1:33 PM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01001. Complaint by TRENT M. GARDNER on behalf of JOSEPH V. WOMACK against Roth Enterprises, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (GARDNER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons