Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:24-cv-00042
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 4:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Chloeta Fire LLC
Defendant
Emily Cochran
Defendant
Alex Combow
Defendant
Joel Dean
Defendant
Chet Dodrill
Defendant
Troy German
Defendant
Meridith Kemp
Defendant
Mark Masters
Defendant
Oklahoma City City of
Defendant
James Storment
Plaintiff
Leonard Henry
Individual 3744 NW 36th Apt 209
Oklahoma City, OK 73112
Plaintiff
Adrian Werner
Plaintiff
Mellissa Varney
Plaintiff
Leon Tullis
Plaintiff
Shelly Sawatzky
Plaintiff
Wayne Hall, II
Plaintiff
David A Arndt
Individual 208 Halbrook Dr
El Reno, OK 73036


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/26 3:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order,9 Judgment,, as to Leonard Henry (rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Mail Returned Contents
Monday, April 15, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Mon 04/15 2:55 PM
JUDGMENT. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a), and in accordance with the Court's Order issued this date, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 4/15/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/15 2:53 PM
ORDER . The Court DISMISSES1 Plaintiffs' Complaint without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order [Doc. No. 6]. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 4/15/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
7 7 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/21 10:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re6 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,, as to Leonard Henry (rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Mail Returned Contents
Friday, March 15, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/15 3:00 PM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS the Plaintiffs to show cause within 14 days, or by March 29, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs are unable to show cause, by March 29, 2024, Plaintiffs may voluntarily dismiss the action without prejudice in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 03/15/24. (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/18 12:11 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Ardnt. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/18/2024. (mc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/17 12:11 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ~ Case reassigned to Judge Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard M. Jones no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/17/2024. (dwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 motion Compel Fri 01/12 3:54 PM
MOTION to Compel by David A Arndt. (naa)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/12 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (naa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/12 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Chloeta Fire LLC, Emily Cochran, Alex Combow, Joel Dean, Chet Dodrill, Troy German, Leonard Henry, Meridith Kemp, Mark Masters, Oklahoma City City of, James Storment filed by David A Arndt.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Document,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet