New Mexico District Court
Judge:Matthew L Garcia
Referred: Kevin R Sweazea
Case #: 1:24-cv-00048
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 3:58 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Philip Soltero
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Robert J. Ritter
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Knight Scientific Systems LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Alan Andrews
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
William Culver
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
John J. Kelly
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tau Technologies LLC
Represented By
Nicole True
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John Bragonje
Lewis Roca Rothgerber, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alan Andrews
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Defendant
William Culver
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Defendant
John J. Kelly
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Defendant
Knight Scientific Systems LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Defendant
Robert J. Ritter
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Defendant
Philip Soltero
Represented By
Christopher M. Moody
Moody & Stanford PC
contact info
Repps D Stanford
Moody & Stanford, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tau Technologies LLC
Represented By
Nicole True
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John E Bragonje
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John Bragonje
Lewis Roca Rothgerber, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 31 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 5 Motion to Commence Expedited Limited Discovery on Nonparty BackBlaze, Inc. (atc)
GPO Feb 22 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' answers due March 7, 2024. (atc)
GPO Mar 15 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims and respond to Motion to Compel Arbitration. Answer and response due by March 29, 2024. (atc)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting50 Second Joint Motion for an Extension. The deadline for the parties to submit closing documents is extended to June 3, 2025. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ldm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
50 50 Second MOTION to Extend (other) Joint Motion to Extend Time to Submit Closing Documents by Tau Technologies LLC. (Bragonje, John)
Related: [-]
49 49 Joint Status Report Parties' Third Joint Status Report and Second Joint Motion for An Extension by Tau Technologies LLC (Bragonje, John)
Related: [-]