New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-bk-10343
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jun 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Jersey Wholesale Tire Corporation
3143 Bordentown Ave Bldg 7
Parlin, NJ 08859-1163
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
129 129 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 01/09 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
128 128 order Compensation Mon 01/06 2:10 PM
Order Granting Application For Compensation for Donald F. Campbell, fees awarded: $185,810.50, expenses awarded: $2,013.65 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/6/2025. (rms)
Related: [-] 125
court Hearing Held Mon 01/06 11:05 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 125 Final Application for Compensation for Donald F. Campbell Jr., Debtor's Attorney, period: 12/4/2023 to 6/27/2024, fee: $185810.50, expenses: $2013.65. Filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr.. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Application #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor Jersey Wholesale Tire Corporation