Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-00086
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Circuit Court, 2024-CA-000189-O
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
SFR Services L.L.C.
Represented By
Bradley Pepper
Bradley Pepper, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Bryan Alper
Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Southern Florida Restoration, LLC
Represented By
Bradley Pepper
Bradley Pepper, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Bryan Alper
Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
South Florida Real Estate, LLC
Represented By
Bradley Pepper
Bradley Pepper, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Bryan Alper
Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Jeffrey E. Streitfeld
Streitfeld Law, PLLC 101 NE Third Ave. Suite 1500
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By
Erin Hyde
Thomas C. Allison, P.A.
contact info
Thomas Charles Allison
Thomas C. Allison, P.A.
contact info
Erin Brenna Hyde
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Luis Miguel Perez
Thomas C. Allison, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
43 43 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 7:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
42 42 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/12 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SFR Services, LLC, South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 7:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc..(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Friday, January 24, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/24 10:29 AM
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 37 is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint 18 is GRANTED in part as set forth in the Report and Recommendation and this Order and DENIED in all other respects. The Amended Complaint 17 is DISMISSED without prejudice. On or before January 29, 2025, Plaintiff may file an amended pleading to correct the deficiencies noted in the Report and Recommendation and this Order. Failure to timely file an amended pleading may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/24/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/31 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. re37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re18 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 12/18 11:39 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint in light of the 37 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 12/18/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 12/18 11:37 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss. See Report for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 12/18/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
36 36 adr Mediation report Mon 12/02 3:18 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on November 25, 2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order Mon 12/02 1:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING the parties to file a Notice with the Court on the outcome of the mediation in this case. The Parties shall file such Notice on or before December 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 12/2/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 10/21 3:11 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 22 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 10/21/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 10/21 3:02 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway: MOTION HEARING held on 10/21/2024 re22 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Digital) (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 10/17 10:56 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 25, 2024 at 9 AM ET before Judge Jeffrey Streitfeld. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 1:57 PM
NOTICE by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of Cancellation of Mediation (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/11 9:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin Hyde is terminated from this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 10/11/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/10 7:22 PM
MOTION for Erin Hyde to Withdraw as Attorney by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.. (Hyde, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
27 27 misc Certificate of compliance Tue 10/08 9:06 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 3.01(G) re22 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Alper, Joshua) Modified on 10/8/2024 (SPM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
26 26 respoth Response Mon 10/07 5:10 PM
RESPONSE re24 Notice (Other) filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 10/07 4:12 PM
NOTICE of hearing on motion re (22 in 6:24-cv-00086-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law , (29 in 6:24-cv-00777-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents , (30 in 6:24-cv-00783-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents . Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. If the parties intend to order a transcript, please notify the courtroom deputy before the hearing to have a court reporter present. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/02 4:27 PM
NOTICE by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC re22 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,23 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Filing Emails Between Counsel Regarding Conferral Effords Prior to Defendants' Filing Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 In Compliance with Local Rule 3.01(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Emails Between Counsel
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/02 2:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc..(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
22 22 motion Compel Wed 09/18 2:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC.(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Dockside's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/17 5:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Amend17 Amended Complaint filed by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
20 20 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 09/09 6:36 PM
MOTION to Amend17 Amended Complaint by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc..(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 08/28 4:24 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 23, 2024 at 9 AM ET before Judge Jeffrey Streitfeld. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 18, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sun 08/18 9:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/07 10:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc..(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 07/24 9:23 AM
ORDER adopting and confirming 15 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.The Complaint dismissed without prejudice. On or before August 7, 2024, Plaintiff may file an amended pleading in accordance with the Report and Recommendation and this Order. Failure to timely do so may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/24/2024. (MDJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
15 15 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 07/08 12:24 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' 3 Motion to Dismiss. See Report for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/8/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 04/29 2:32 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 03/22 12:58 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2024 Discovery due by 8/1/2025 Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2025 Pretrial statement due by 1/5/2026 All other motions due by 12/2/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/3/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/3/2025 Trial Status Conference set for 1/13/2026 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the February 2026 trial term commencing on 2/2/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/15/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/22/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 misc Case Management Report Wed 03/06 4:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/13 8:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 8:49 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. for Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc... (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Tue 02/13 8:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Charles Allison on behalf of Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of appearance Tue 01/30 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Pepper on behalf of SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC (Pepper, Bradley)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 1:10 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/30 1:08 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC.(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sunbiz Showing Dissolution and Fictitious Name Registration
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/30 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Tue 01/30 12:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/30/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/29 3:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SFR Services L.L.C., South Florida Real Estate, LLC, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/16 2:44 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-86-WWB-RMN. (ARC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/15 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of The Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-00189-O filed in State Court on January 8, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21656297 filed by South Florida Real Estate, Southern Florida Restoration, LLC, SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Scope of Work,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Trial Court Docket and Filings,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Southern Florida Restoration, LLC 2021 Annual Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Southern Florida Restoration Fictitious Name Registration,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Affidavit of Ricky McGraw in Support of Removal,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Affidavit of Jessica McGraw in Support of Removal,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Copies of Drivers' Licenses of Ricky and Jessica McGraw,
Att: 11 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 12 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 13 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet