Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Referred: Renee Harris Toliver
Case #: 3:24-cv-00105
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 4:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Diagnostic Channel Partners LLC
619 12th Street #876
Golden, CO 80401
Plaintiff
Community Direct DX LLC
Represented By
Victor Daniel John
Shields Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
David A Shields
Shields Legal Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
22 22 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 03/19 5:04 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Community Direct DX LLC (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
21 21 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/25 10:40 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Diagnostic Channel Partners LLC. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 02/12 7:54 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Community Direct DX LLC. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to Request to Clerk to Enter Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 to Request to Clerk to Enter Default,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 2B,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Substitute Party Mon 10/21 3:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court are Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint , Doc.9 , Plaintiff Community Direct DX, LLC's Motion to Strike Defendant's Pro Se Pleadings , Doc.11 , and Defendant's Motion to Substitute Parties , Doc.16 . Plaintiff is correct that Defendant has impermissibly filed pro se motions on behalf of his LLC instead of acquiring counsel. See Yanmar Am. Corp. v. Vina Tractor Co. , 2013 WL 12123943, at *1 (N.D. Tex. Mar. 20, 2013). Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike is GRANTED and Defendant's two pro se motions are hereby STRUCK . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/21/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 respm Appendix in Support Thu 05/09 4:02 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Community Direct DX LLC re17 Response/Objection to Defendant's Pro Se Motion and Motion to Strike Pro Se Motion (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
17 17 respm Response/Objection Thu 05/09 3:58 PM
OBJECTION filed by Community Direct DX LLC re:16 MOTION to Substitute Party (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
16 16 motion Substitute Party Thu 05/09 8:03 AM
MOTION to Substitute Parties filed by Diagnostic Channel Partners LLC. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/01 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Defendant's Deadline to Respond re:11 MOTION to Strike9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Community Direct DX LLC (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
misc Remark Fri 03/22 12:01 PM
The Clerk declines to enter an Entry of Default per the attempt to defend re:9 Motion to Dismiss. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
14 14 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 03/19 4:58 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Clerks Entry of Default filed by Community Direct DX LLC. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit(s)
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
13 13 2 pgs misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 03/13 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community Direct DX LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 2 pgs respm Appendix in Support Mon 03/11 3:53 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Community Direct DX LLC re11 MOTION to Strike9 MOTION to Dismiss (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
11 11 5 pgs motion Strike Mon 03/11 3:50 PM
MOTION to Strike9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Community Direct DX LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/08 10:16 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/7/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 03/05 1:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Diagnostic Channel Partners LLC. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 3 pgs service Summons Returned Fri 02/16 5:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Community Direct DX LLC ; served on 2/2/2024. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/29 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Community Direct DX LLC (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/17 5:33 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/17/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 01/17 12:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Diagnostic Channel Partners LLC. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 qcref Fish Wed 01/17 12:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Community Direct DX LLC (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 01/16 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community Direct DX LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/16 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Community Direct DX LLC filed by Community Direct DX LLC. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14314140) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Cover Sheet