Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-10119
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
LBK, LTD, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Carpet Cleaning Co., LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Duct Cleaning, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic II, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Lansing, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Products & Supply Services, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Rugology, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Water Restoration, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Schuster's LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Titans Carpet, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modernistic Leasing, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Brodie
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
John T. Mihelick
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Benjamin S Perry
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cleo Murphy
Represented By
Jesse L. Young
Sommers Schwartz, P.C.
contact info
Paulina Rose Kennedy
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 19, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 08/19 11:03 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 8/20/2024 is Cancelled (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/16 4:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cleo Murphy (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
23 23 notice Appear* Mon 07/08 2:59 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Status Conference set for 8/20/2024 04:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Thu 06/27 4:36 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Sean F. Cox pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-018. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
22 22 notice Notice - Other Fri 05/03 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Cleo Murphy of Filing of Consents to Join, First (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join
Thursday, March 07, 2024
21 21 notice Appearance Thu 03/07 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin S Perry on behalf of All Defendants. (Perry, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
20 20 order Staying Case Thu 02/29 12:19 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to stay case and to toll the statute of limitations of FLSA collective members. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 02/28 2:23 PM
ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DPer)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/27 12:05 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants of Substitution of Counsel (Wallin, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
17 17 order Extend Time to - Free Thu 02/22 1:34 PM
ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 2/29/2024 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SSch)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Tue 02/20 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Mihelick on behalf of All Defendants. (Mihelick, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Titans Carpet, LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Schuster's LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Water Restoration, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Rugology, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Products & Supply Services, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Leasing, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Lansing, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic II, LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Duct Cleaning, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Modernistic Carpet Cleaning Co., LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/31 12:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. LBK, LTD, LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued* Wed 01/17 8:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DJen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 01/17 8:53 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DJen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 01/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Rose Kennedy on behalf of Cleo Murphy. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 01/16 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Cleo Murphy against LBK, LTD, LLC, Modernistic Carpet Cleaning Co., LLC, Modernistic Duct Cleaning, LLC, Modernistic II, LLC, Modernistic Lansing, LLC, Modernistic Leasing, LLC d/b/a Modernistic, Modernistic Products & Supply Services, LLC, Modernistic Rugology, LLC, Modernistic Water Restoration, LLC, Modernistic, LLC, Schuster's LLC, Titans Carpet, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9624798 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join Form