California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-00397
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Owainat Properties LLC
Defendant
Dipak Babulal Parjapaja
Defendant
Leonel Cabera-Devora
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jardine Gougis
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 04/19 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
13 13 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 02/23 6:18 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-033) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-00397-MRA (ASx). (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
12 12 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 02/22 12:17 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 02/05 12:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis, upon Defendant Owainat Properties LLC served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Majed A. Owainat - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/30 11:19 AM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/23 11:57 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/17 2:50 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Owainat Properties LLC, Dipak Babulal Parjapaja. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 01/17 2:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 01/16 3:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 01/16 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 01/16 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jardine Gougis. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/16 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-36732966 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jardine Gougis(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]