Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-80001

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 8:24-bk-80026
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 31, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
My Vision Express, Inc.
555 S Mangum St Ste 100
Durham, NC 27701-4689
Represented By
Jason S. Brookner
Gray Reed & Mcgraw LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
12 12 order Final decree Tue 12/31 9:30 AM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 12/31/2024 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 misc Schedules Wed 03/13 6:41 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor My Vision Express, Inc.. (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
10 10 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 02/19 9:55 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual MY VISION EXPRESS, INC . Filed by Debtor My Vision Express, Inc.. (Carson, Amber)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 02/19 9:12 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual MY VISION EXPRESS, INC . Filed by Debtor My Vision Express, Inc. Related [+]. (Carson, Amber)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
8 8 misc Schedules Mon 02/19 8:33 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor My Vision Express, Inc. Related [+]. (Carson, Amber)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Monday, January 22, 2024
7 7 order Joint administration Mon 01/22 1:25 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 8:24-bk-80001 with member case 8:24-bk-80026. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1(a) of the Local Bankruptcy Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas directing joint administration for procedural purposes of the chapter11 cases of Eye Care Leaders Portfolio Holdings LLC, et al. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 24-80001 (MVL). All orders, pleadings, papers, and documents, except proofs of claim, lists, schedules, and statements, shall be filed and docketed in the Lead Case. Related [+] Entered on 1/22/2024. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 3
Sunday, January 21, 2024
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 01/21 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2024 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 5/28/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/15/2024.
Friday, January 19, 2024
5 5 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 01/19 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 1/30/2024. Schedule D due 1/30/2024. Schedule E/F due 1/30/2024. Schedule G due 1/30/2024. Schedule H due 1/30/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 1/30/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 1/30/2024. Declaration for electronic filing is due within 7 days from the filing of the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/30/2024. Creditor matrix due 1/19/2024.
Thursday, January 18, 2024
4 4 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 01/18 4:47 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2024 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 5/28/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/15/2024. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 01/18 11:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-80026 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31071454, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
3 3 motion Joint administration Wed 01/17 8:46 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases ECL PH Services Group LLC, Case No. 24-80000 Eye Care Leaders Portfolio Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80001 ECL Group, LLC, Case No. 24-80002 Alta Billing Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80003 Alta Billing, LLC, Case No. 24-80004 Canta Health, LLC, Case No. 24-80005 DJRTC, LLC, Case No. 24-80006 ECL Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80007 iMedicWare, Inc., Case No. 24-80008 IMW EMR, LLC, Case No. 24-80009 IMW Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80010 Insight Software, LLC, Case No. 24-80011 Integrity EMR Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80012 Integrity EMR, LLC, Case No. 24-80013 IO PracticeWare, Inc., Case No. 24-80014 IOPW Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80015 IOPW, LLC, Case No. 24-80016 KeyMed Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80017 KeyMed, LLC, Case No. 24-80018 MD Office, LLC, Case No. 24-80019 MDO Group Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80020 MDX, LLC, Case No. 24-80021 Medflow Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80022 Medflow, Inc., Case No. 24-80023 MNI Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80024 MRX Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80025 My Vision Express, Inc., Case No. 24-80026 Penn Medical Informatics Systems, LLC, Case No. 24-80027 PI Software Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80028 PI Software, LLC, Case No. 24-80029 PMX, LLC, Case No. 24-80030 Revenue Health Solutions, LLC, Case No. 24-80031 RHS Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80032 The Hoehne Group - Software Division, Inc., Case No. 24-80033 Eye Care Leaders Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-80034 Filed by Debtor My Vision Express, Inc. (Carson, Amber)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Wed 01/17 9:33 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 1/30/2024. Schedule D due 1/30/2024. Schedule E/F due 1/30/2024. Schedule G due 1/30/2024. Schedule H due 1/30/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 1/30/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 1/30/2024. Declaration for electronic filing is due within 7 days from the filing of the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/30/2024. Creditor matrix due 1/19/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
1 1 29 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Tue 01/16 7:18 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by My Vision Express, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/15/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 05/15/2024. (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-]