New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: J Brendan Day
Case #: 3:24-cv-00216
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MID L 006684 23
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
IH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
ALEXANDRA AGNOSTAK
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
FOTINI KARAMBOULIS
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
MANUEL CASTRO
Represented By
JUSTIN DAY
Brandon J Broderick LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
27 27 order Text Order Mon 01/06 3:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the 1/6/25 telephone status conference, the parties shall confer regarding their intentions for proceeding with mediation. The Court will take appropriate action upon receipt of the parties' letter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 1/6/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/06 2:47 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/26 11:25 AM
LETTER ORDER granting request for a 60 day extension of time to complete fact discovery through 3/3/3025. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/26/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Fri 12/20 1:25 PM
Letter from Nancy J. Arencibia, Esq.. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
24 24 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/09 10:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for 12/16/2024 is rescheduled to 1/6/2025 at 2:00 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/9/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/03 2:16 PM
CONSENT ORDER that the NJ Department of Labor is to produce to Jackson Lewis P.C. and and all unemployment compensation records. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/3/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 misc Proposed Order Mon 12/02 5:28 PM
Proposed Order Consent Order by IH SERVICES, INC.. (ARENCIBIA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
21 21 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/26 9:33 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall complete fact discovery no later than 12/31/24. All other deadlines for expert discovery and dispositive motions in the operative scheduling order are adjourned pending further order of the Court. The Court will hold a telephone status conference on 12/16/2024 at 2:00 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. No later than three (3) business days before the telephone status conference, the parties shall file a joint letter via CM/ECF, not to exceed three (3) pages, that summarizes the status of discovery and identifies any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 9/26/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
minutes Status Conference Thu 09/26 9:26 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/25/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/24 10:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for 9/25/2024 shall be held at 11:30 a.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 9/24/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
19 19 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/19 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on 9/25/2024 at 3:30 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 8/19/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
minutes Status Conference Mon 08/19 9:51 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Status Conference held on 8/15/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 08/12 1:03 PM
Letter. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 08/08 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for 8/15/2024 shall be held at 3:00 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 8/8/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
16 16 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 07/25 11:39 AM
Discovery Confidentiality Order filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 7/25/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Wed 07/24 2:35 PM
Proposed Order by IH SERVICES, INC.. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/22 2:32 PM
Proposed Order by IH SERVICES, INC.. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
13 13 order ~Util - Set Hearings Text Order Thu 06/20 8:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on 8/15/2024 at 2:30 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. No later than three (3) business days before the telephone status conference, the parties shall file a joint letter via CM/ECF, not to exceed three (3) pages, that summarizes the status of discovery and identifies any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 6/20/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/20 8:34 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Wed 06/12 12:01 PM
Letter from Nancy J. Arencibia, Esq.. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/22 1:53 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed no later than 5/24/2024. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 3/22/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 03/25 1:53 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 03/07 4:35 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by IH SERVICES, INC..(KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FOTINI KARAMBOULIS on behalf of IH SERVICES, INC. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 3:56 PM
Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by IH SERVICES, INC..(AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 02/05 11:37 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 2/5/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Mon 02/05 10:31 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The6 Answer to Complaint submitted by Alexandra Agnostak on 2/2/2024 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 4:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by IH SERVICES, INC..(AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA AGNOSTAK on behalf of IH SERVICES, INC. (AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 01/16 11:39 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The4 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by IH SERVICES, INC. on 1/12/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/2/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IH SERVICES, INC.. (AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
2 2 Exhibit to1 Notice of Removal, by IH SERVICES, INC..(AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Compliance,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Cert of Service
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IH SERVICES, INC. from SUSUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY MIDDLESEX COUNTY LAW DIVISION, case number MID-L-006684-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15007659), filed by IH SERVICES, INC..(AGNOSTAK, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/16 11:35 AM
Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (kht)
Related: [-]