South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 2:24-cv-00223
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 6:22 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Paul Barry Trainor
Hall Booth Smith (chas)
contact info
Rostyslaw J Smyk
Ruberry Stalmack And Garvery Llc (il)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cameron L Marshall
Represented By
Morris Dawes Cooke, Jr
Barnwell Whaley Patterson And Helms (cha)
contact info
Oana D Johnson
Oana D Johnson Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Paul Barry Trainor
Hall Booth Smith (chas)
contact info
Rostyslaw J Smyk
Ruberry Stalmack And Garvery Llc (il)
contact info
Plaintiff
Cameron L Marshall
Represented By
Morris Dawes Cooke, Jr
Barnwell Whaley Patterson And Helms (cha)
contact info
Oana D Johnson
Oana D Johnson Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
34 34 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability Tue 01/14 2:18 PM
ORDER denying 31 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by the Honorable David C. Norton on January 14, 2025. (estr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
33 33 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 12/02 1:31 PM
RESPONSE in Support re31 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Response filed by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhbiit A- Email
Friday, November 22, 2024
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/22 5:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Response filed by Cameron L Marshall.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/2/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
31 31 motion Certificate of Appealability Fri 11/08 1:32 PM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Memo ISO 1292 Certification 11.8.24
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
30 30 19 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 10/15 11:49 AM
ORDER denying 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 28 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by the Honorable David C. Norton on October 15, 2024. (estr,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 09/17 3:23 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2024 re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. The Court will issue an order. Court Reporter Karen Martin. (ccau, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Mon 09/16 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum
Thursday, September 12, 2024
27 27 misc Reply Not to a Motion Thu 09/12 10:14 AM
REPLY by Cameron L Marshall to8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,,10 Reply Amended . (Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/10 1:02 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion to excuse local counsel from hearing on pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. Entered at the direction of Honorable David C Norton on 09/10/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Fri 07/26 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2024 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2024 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 07/26 11:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion to Continue. Entered at the direction of Honorable David C Norton on 07/26/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 motion Continue Fri 07/19 12:29 PM
MOTION to Continue by Cameron L Marshall. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Thu 07/18 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2024 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2024 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/02 10:41 AM
MOTION Motion to Reschedule August 6th Hearing by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/02 10:39 AM
MOTION Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Hearing by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 06/26 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2024 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 05/28 4:59 PM
RESPONSE in Support re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. (Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/15 7:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by Cameron L Marshall.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/22/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/08 12:32 PM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs are hereby granted a 7-day extension of time, until May 15, 2024, to file a Response in opposition to the Defendants' Motion for Judgement. The time for Defendant's Reply should be extended accordingly by 14-days to June 5, 2024. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 05/08/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/07 2:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs by Cameron L Marshall. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/24 12:12 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff is hereby granted a 14-day extension of time, until May 8, 2024, to file a Response in opposition to the Defendant's Motion for Judgment. The time for Defendant's Reply should be extended accordingly by 7- days to May 22, 2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Replies due by 5/22/2024. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 04/24/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/23 2:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Judgement on Pleadings by Cameron L Marshall. Response to Motion due by 5/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
11 11 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 04/10 1:29 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 4/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Marshall- Memorandum ISO Motion Judgment on the Pleadings 4.10.24
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 misc Reply Not to a Motion Thu 03/14 4:49 PM
REPLY by Cameron L Marshall . (Johnson, Oana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/05 2:50 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/11/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/10/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 5/10/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/24/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/15/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/16/2024, Discovery due by 12/6/2024, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 1/10/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 2/1/2025, Mediation Due by 1/31/2025. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 03/05/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 02/28 1:09 PM
ISMIE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cameron L Marshall by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - ATEMS Complaint71,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ATEMS Affidavit of Default15,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Marshall Appearance88,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Motion Enlargement Time56,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 2014 04 30 Order3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Motion to Reconsider68,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Order Denying Reconsider4,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Order of Judgment,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Notice of Appeal68,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Appellate Court Affirm94,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K - ISMIE Policy75,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Underlying Complaint14,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M - Disclaimer Letter
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/26 2:11 PM
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rostyslaw J. Smyk for ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/26/2024. (gray)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Fri 02/23 11:57 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rostyslaw J. Smyk ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11609727) by ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A.- RJS Pro Hac Vice Application
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/23 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Barry Trainor on behalf of ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company (Trainor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/16 1:28 PM
Summons Issued as to ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company. (gray)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 01/16 1:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cameron L Marshall. (gray)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/16 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against ISMIE Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11527043), filed by Cameron L Marshall. Service due by 4/11/2024. (gray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Underlying Suit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of potential claim,
Att: 3 Exhibit Policy