Adams et al v. Bonneville Power Administration et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mustafa T Kasubhai |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 42:1396 - Tort Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bonneville Power Administration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Eugene Water & Electric Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Adams
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carey Anderson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Anderson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Archer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Arian
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caralyn Arnold
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Baker
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannie Barr
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Barr
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margo Barranti
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bash Residential, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Bates, Jr.
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Bates
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bates Catering, Inc.
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Beaubien
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Behm
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Bethell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafe Bethell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Booth
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara Booth
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Borjesson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Borjesson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Brandal
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Brandal
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Brinn
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brady Brooks
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carollyn Broom
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Leland Broom
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Butler
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassidy Campbell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Campbell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Campbell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Campbell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Campbell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Canfield
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherrie Canfield
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Cervi-Skinner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Cervi-Skinner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Codee Clark
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janelle Conner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Conner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Courtnage
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Courtnage
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Courtney
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carleton Terrence Coveny
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Curry
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia Dahl
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Deleon
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leian Deleon
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Douglas
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earth Quest Partners, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earthscapes of Oregon, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Eason
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Elersich
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emsea Creative, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Erdahl
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodi Erdahl
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanne Fager
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Fair
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Finn Rock Timber, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merrick Firestone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Firestone
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Fitzgerald
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Thomas Flint
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Forrest
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quenton Fraser
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marsha Gabbard
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonny Gabbard
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Gabriel
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Gabriel
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nailah Garner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elnara Gasanova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Gibson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Godfrey
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Godfrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Godsy
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Godsy
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geff Gravitt
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geff Gravitt, II
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anabella Greb
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Greb
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Gumpert
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesa Henson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Hickman
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Hickman
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacklyn Hoffman
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Hogan
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helen Hutchinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Illahe Properties, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iron Forest Oregon, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Ivey
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Johnson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Johnson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Kane
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sally Kane
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ky Karnecki
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Knight
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Knight
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Knight
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Koehler
personally 685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Kumm
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Kumm
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Landgreen
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donnel Lang
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lavoie
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lawson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Lowry
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lowry
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Lowry
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanya Luttrell
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M&M Land and Cattle Co., LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Maddock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Marchacos
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Marchacos
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Mayorga
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark McInnis
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andy McWilliams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth McWilliams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Merrill
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Miner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Miner
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Moore
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Moore
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Moore
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Morden
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colton Morris
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gale Morris
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly Morris
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Charles Mortimer
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Moss
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Moss
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cyndie Moyer
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Murphy
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Myers
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Myhrvold
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Myhrvold
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Nesslin
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shaun Nugent
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nugent Holdings, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion O'Leary
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oregon Mountain Adventures, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Plaid Hedgehog, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daryl Lynn Polamero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perry Polamero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Prout
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Ragan
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katelyn Randall
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Rawles
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Lee Rawles, Jr.
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Richards
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Ricks
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Roberts
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robbin Rodderick
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Roderick
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Rose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynette Sanders
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Sangermano
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lou Sangermano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Sather
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McKenna Schmitt
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sequoia Environmental Services, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Majeed Sharifie
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jared Simmons
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Simmons
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Sims
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Snyder
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Spady
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Stevens
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Sughroue
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seth Sughroue
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amie Swallow
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Swallow
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Swezey
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lana Swezey
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Brothers Timber, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Terborg
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Terry
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Veralrud
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Veralrud
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Victor
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Watts
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Weichselbaum
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merideth Wendland
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whispering Pines Oregon, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wild Mountain, LLC
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orville E Wilkerson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Wilkerson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Wilson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilee Wilson
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Wright
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Wright
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Van Young
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miler Zamora-Fraser
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Zietz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Zimmerman
685 Church Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marisa Aieta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Behm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Behm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merlin Call
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carleton T. Coveny
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Davenport
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McKenzie Mist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion OLeary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oregon Cliff House, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cameron Simpson Randall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack T. Rose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Sangermano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia K. Spady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda K. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
102 | 102
order
1 - Scheduling
Thu 04/24 4:39 PM
Scheduling Order by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: At the request of counsel, Oral Argument set for 07/18/2025 is RESET for 8/29/2025 at 01:30PM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction EWEB's and LEC's Crossclaims ( 116 in 6:24-cv-00089-MTK,81 in 6:24-cv-00092-MTK, 84 in 6:24-cv-00203-MTK) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( 84 in 6:24-cv-00089-MTK,54 in 6:24-cv-00092-MTK,58 in 6:24-cv-00203-MTK). Associated Cases: 6:24-cv-00089-MTK, 6:24-cv-00092-MTK, 6:24-cv-00203-MTK. (bd) |