District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-00142
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP.
Represented By
Paul J. Kennedy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Alison N. Davis
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Morgan Kinney
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Brian Iwashyna
Plaintiff
GITA F. SANKANO
Represented By
Jeanne-Marie Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Michael J. Willemin
Wigdor LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 04/23 8:31 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re27 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Brian Iwashyna, TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP..(Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts Reply/Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 53 pgs respm Response to motion Tue 04/01 10:13 AM
RESPONSE re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Opposition - with Redactions filed by GITA F. SANKANO.(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts in Response - Redacted,
Att: 3 Declaration of Michael J. Willemin,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 - Redacted,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9,
Att: 13 Exhibit 10,
Att: 14 Exhibit 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit 12,
Att: 16 Exhibit 13,
Att: 17 Exhibit 14,
Att: 18 Exhibit 15,
Att: 19 Exhibit 16,
Att: 20 Exhibit 17,
Att: 21 Exhibit 18,
Att: 22 Exhibit 19,
Att: 23 Exhibit 20,
Att: 24 Exhibit 21,
Att: 25 Exhibit 22,
Att: 26 Exhibit 23,
Att: 27 Exhibit 24,
Att: 28 Exhibit 25,
Att: 29 Exhibit 26,
Att: 30 Exhibit 27,
Att: 31 Exhibit 28,
Att: 32 Exhibit 29,
Att: 33 Exhibit 30,
Att: 34 Exhibit 31,
Att: 35 Exhibit 32,
Att: 36 Exhibit 33,
Att: 37 Exhibit 34,
Att: 38 Exhibit 35,
Att: 39 Exhibit 36,
Att: 40 Exhibit 37,
Att: 41 Exhibit 38,
Att: 42 Exhibit 39,
Att: 43 Exhibit 40,
Att: 44 Exhibit 41,
Att: 45 Exhibit 42,
Att: 46 Exhibit 43 - Redacted,
Att: 47 Exhibit 44,
Att: 48 Exhibit 45,
Att: 49 Exhibit 46,
Att: 50 Exhibit 47,
Att: 51 Exhibit 48,
Att: 52 Exhibit 49,
Att: 53 Exhibit 50,
Att: 54 Exhibit 51,
Att: 55 Exhibit 52,
Att: 56 Exhibit 53,
Att: 57 Exhibit 54,
Att: 58 Exhibit 55,
Att: 59 Exhibit 56,
Att: 60 Exhibit 57,
Att: 61 Exhibit 58,
Att: 62 Exhibit 59,
Att: 63 Exhibit 60
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 2 pgs motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/31 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Redactions and to Seal Dkt. No. 31 by GITA F. SANKANO. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/31 6:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to File and to Seal: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that31 Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is SEALED. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the filings at ECF 31. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff promptly file a redacted version of its filings at ECF 31 on the public docket. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 31, 2025. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
31 31 53 pgs respm Response to motion Wed 03/26 8:11 PM
RESPONSE re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Opposition filed by GITA F. SANKANO.(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 75 pgs Statement of Facts in Response,
Att: 3 Declaration of Michael J. Willemin,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9,
Att: 13 Exhibit 10,
Att: 14 Exhibit 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit 12,
Att: 16 Exhibit 13,
Att: 17 Exhibit 14,
Att: 18 Exhibit 15,
Att: 19 Exhibit 16,
Att: 20 Exhibit 17,
Att: 21 Exhibit 18,
Att: 22 Exhibit 19,
Att: 23 Exhibit 20,
Att: 24 Exhibit 21,
Att: 25 Exhibit 22,
Att: 26 Exhibit 23,
Att: 27 Exhibit 24,
Att: 28 Exhibit 25,
Att: 29 Exhibit 26,
Att: 30 Exhibit 27,
Att: 31 Exhibit 28,
Att: 32 Exhibit 29,
Att: 33 Exhibit 30,
Att: 34 Exhibit 31,
Att: 35 Exhibit 32,
Att: 36 Exhibit 33,
Att: 37 Exhibit 34,
Att: 38 Exhibit 35,
Att: 39 Exhibit 36,
Att: 40 Exhibit 37,
Att: 41 Exhibit 38,
Att: 42 Exhibit 39,
Att: 43 Exhibit 40,
Att: 44 Exhibit 41,
Att: 45 Exhibit 42,
Att: 46 Exhibit 43,
Att: 47 Exhibit 44,
Att: 48 Exhibit 45,
Att: 49 Exhibit 46,
Att: 50 Exhibit 47,
Att: 51 Exhibit 48,
Att: 52 Exhibit 49,
Att: 53 Exhibit 50,
Att: 54 Exhibit 51,
Att: 55 Exhibit 52,
Att: 56 Exhibit 53,
Att: 57 Exhibit 54,
Att: 58 Exhibit 55,
Att: 59 Exhibit 56,
Att: 60 Exhibit 57,
Att: 61 Exhibit 58,
Att: 62 Exhibit 59,
Att: 63 Exhibit 60
Friday, March 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/21 5:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting30 Consent Motion for Extension: Having considered the consent motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by March 26, 2025, and Defendants' reply in support of their motion is due by April 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 21, 2025. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/20 6:05 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment Motion by GITA F. SANKANO. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 02/18 11:28 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment Motion by GITA F. SANKANO. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Tue 02/18 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment Motion . The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect format (Letter)- correspondence is not permitted (LCvR 5.1(a)). Please refile. (zdp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/18 6:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting29 Consent Motion for Extension: Having considered the consent motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by March 24, 2025, and Defendants' reply in support of their motion is due by April 18, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 18, 2025. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/14 3:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment Motion by GITA F. SANKANO. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
27 27 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/31 7:47 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP., Brian Iwashyna.(Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 47 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 20 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 120 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 164 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L,
Att: 15 Exhibit M,
Att: 16 Exhibit N,
Att: 17 Exhibit O,
Att: 18 Exhibit P,
Att: 19 Exhibit Q,
Att: 20 Exhibit R,
Att: 21 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/02 1:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held Via Video (ZOOM) before Judge Jia M. Cobb: Post Discovery Status Conference held on 12/2/2024. Parties Updated The Court On The Current Posture Of This Matter. Defendant Consolidated Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2024. Plaintiff Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/3/2025. Defendant Reply to Plaintiff Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/17/2025. (Court Reporter STACEY JOHNS.) (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/26 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kassandra Vazquez on behalf of GITA F. SANKANO (Vazquez, Kassandra)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/26 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Payton on behalf of GITA F. SANKANO (Payton, Brooke)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/26 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Brooke Pamela Payton is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 26, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 3:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brooke Payton, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11321452. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GITA F. SANKANO.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brooke Payton in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, October 28, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/28 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Kassandra Vazquez is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 28, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/23 12:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kassandra Vazquez, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11252198. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GITA F. SANKANO.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that the close of fact discovery is extended to November 18, 2024. The Court further ORDERS that the Parties appear for a post-discovery status conference on December 2, 2024, at 1:30 PM. The conference will be on the record before Judge Jia M. Cobb and conducted via Zoom. The Courts Deputy Clerk will provide the information necessary to access the call. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 15, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/03 6:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery proposing November 18, 2024 deadline and December 2, 2024 post-discovery status conference by GITA F. SANKANO.(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
21 21 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 08/22 4:29 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Protective Order: Notwithstanding any language in the attached document, the Parties are reminded that the14 Scheduling Order in this case requires any party that wishes to file a document under seal to first file a motion to seal, and establishes the procedures for doing so. The Scheduling Order also sets forth the procedures the Parties are required to follow to alert the Court to any discovery dispute, including a dispute about the contents of the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 22, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
20 20 8 pgs motion Protective Order Wed 08/21 9:55 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by Brian Iwashyna, TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP.. (Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 47 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/06 6:35 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by Brian Iwashyna.(Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 55 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/20 3:45 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP..(Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
17 17 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 06/06 10:43 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GITA F. SANKANO. (zdp)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs cmp Request for Summons to Issue Thu 06/06 10:17 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to Brian Iwashyna filed by GITA F. SANKANO.(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
15 15 43 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/05 2:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP., Brian Iwashyna with Jury Demand filed by GITA F. SANKANO.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
14 14 order .Order Scheduling Order Mon 04/29 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 29, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/25 1:44 PM
Minute Entry for Zoom Initial Scheduling Conference proceeding held on 4/25/2024 before Judge Jia M. Cobb. Post Discovery Status Conference set for 11/1/2024 at 10:30 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Jia M. Cobb. Scheduling Order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter Sara Wick) (zgf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
13 13 4 pgs misc Meet and Confer Statement Thu 04/18 6:24 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Kinney on behalf of TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. (Kinney, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/21 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: setting Initial Scheduling Conference for April 25, 2024 at 1:00 P.M., before Judge Jia M. Cobb. The conference will be on the record and conducted via video. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the information necessary to access the conference. The Parties shall file a joint report pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(2) by April 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 21, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Kennedy on behalf of TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. (Kennedy, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison N. Davis on behalf of TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. (Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Wed 03/20 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding9 Notice of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison N. Davis on behalf of TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. (Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 03/19 6:12 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. (Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
7 7 41 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 6:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP..(Davis, Alison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/14 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Willemin on behalf of GITA F. SANKANO (Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/05 2:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 5, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/01 5:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Willemin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10661991. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GITA F. SANKANO.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael J. Willemin,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Wed 01/24 5:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP. waiver sent on 1/19/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 01/19 10:37 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP..(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/19 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
2 2 misc Errata Wed 01/17 5:25 PM
ERRATA by GITA F. SANKANO. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/17 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT against TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10622033) filed by GITA F. SANKANO.(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons
notice Notice of QC- New Case Wed 01/17 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to jchristensen@wigdorlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata. (cb, )
Related: [-]