New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:24-bk-40218
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Citadel of Praise & Worship, Inc.
105 Barbey St Apt 107
Brooklyn, NY 11207-2201
Represented By
Ilevu Yakubov
Jacobs PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
83 83 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 05/02 12:21 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from May 6, 2025 at 10:30 am to June 24, 2025 at 9:30 am Filed by Robert M Sasloff on behalf of Citadel of Praise & Worship, Inc. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Fri 05/02 12:23 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 06/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 12 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Thursday, May 01, 2025
82 82 motion Protective Order Thu 05/01 10:05 AM
Motion for Protective Order Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order Filed by Randy M Kornfeld on behalf of Citadel of Praise & Worship, Inc.. (Kornfeld, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Order to Show Cause
Att: 2 Affirmation in Support of Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
court Hearing Sched/Resched (Document) Wed 04/30 3:50 PM
TELEPHONIC COURT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED for 5/1/2025 at 11:00 AM VIA WEBEX TELECONFERENCE. (agh)
Related: [-]