Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00192
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 18, 2024 1:35 AM CST
Defendant
Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Shane Michael McMahon
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/18/2024 2:05 AM CST
Friday, January 12, 2024
Arrest of Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez (epda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez. (epda)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez. (epda)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (epda)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez held on 1/16/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/29/2024 08:30AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, SPANISH Language Interpreter (T. Saenz) required as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez (Court Reporter ERO.) (epda)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (epda)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Dorian Manuel Guerrero-Hernandez. By Judge Leon Schydlower. (epda)
Related: [-]