California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00363
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
AT and T Inc.
Defendant
Luis Abinader
Defendant
AeroSmith
Defendant
Ambassador of the United States of America to France
Defendant
Ambassador of the United States to Sweden
Defendant
Annopolis, Maryland
Defendant
Atlanta Falcons
Defendant
Atlanta United 2
Defendant
Bayer AG
Defendant
BeeHive Records LLC
Defendant
Silvio Berlusconi
Defendant
Bird Global, Inc.
Defendant
Brown University
Defendant
Buffalo Philharmonic Orchestra
Defendant
Cathedral of Saint Mary of the Assumption
Defendant
Cathedral of the Immaculate Conception
Defendant
Catheral of Christ the King Atlanta
Defendant
Catholic Health Assoication of the United States of America
Defendant
Ray Charles
Defendant
Charleston, South Carolina
Defendant
China Resources Holdings Company Limited
Defendant
Christian Church
Defendant
Christmas Island
Defendant
Cincinnati Reds
Defendant
City of Frankfurt
Defendant
City of Kirksville
Defendant
Congregation Tfereth Israel
Defendant
Corona A Station Post Office
Defendant
Crystal City, Texas
Defendant
Cystal City, Virginia
Defendant
Darcus Beese
Defendant
Deutsche Grammophon
Defendant
Deutsche Telekom
Defendant
Christos Dimas
Defendant
Diocese of Lake Charles
Defendant
Diocese of Salsona
Defendant
Dish Network Corporation
Defendant
Dominoes Pizza
Defendant
Aubrea Drake Graham
Defendant
Drakes Seat
Defendant
DukeKunehan University
Defendant
Easter Island
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Boston
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of New York
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Philadephia
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis
Defendant
Federal Reserve of Atlanta
Defendant
Federal Reserve of Cleveland
Defendant
Federal Reserve of Richmond
Defendant
Isabella Janet Florentina Summers
Defendant
George Floridis
Defendant
Fort St Charles
Defendant
Franciscan Manestery of the Holly Land in America
Defendant
Franconia, Germany
Defendant
French Academy in Rome
Defendant
Galatasaray Sports Club
Defendant
Genesis Limousine Service
Defendant
Giardino de Tarocchi
Defendant
Gold Coast Queenardy, Australia
Defendant
Good and Drug Administration
Defendant
Christopher Percy Gordon Blackwell
Defendant
Hamm, Germany
Defendant
Steve Harvey
Defendant
His Majestys Prison and Probation Service
Defendant
Holy Catholic Catheral of Saint Francis of Aggisi
Defendant
O Shea Jackson, Sr.
Defendant
Trinidad James
Defendant
Klaus Johannis
Defendant
Jurassic World-The Ride
Defendant
Kane and Abel
Defendant
Kings County
Defendant
Victoria La Valle
Defendant
Lake Charles, Louisiana
Defendant
Lionsgate Films
Defendant
Emmanuel Macron
Defendant
Massacre Island Ontario
Defendant
Christina Milian
Defendant
Ministry of Justice
Defendant
Mission San Francisco de Asis
Defendant
Monastere de la Grande Chartreuse
Defendant
Monster
Defendant
Moses Brown School
Defendant
New Canaan Community YMCA
Defendant
Nice, France Town Hall
Defendant
No Limit Records Inc.
Defendant
Frank Ocean
Defendant
Old Cathedral of St. Mary of the Immaculated Conception
Defendant
Opelousas Catholic School
Defendant
Opera Bastille
Defendant
Organisation Internatonale de la Francophanie
Defendant
Joel Osteen
Defendant
Victoria Osteen
Defendant
Father Francesco Patton
Defendant
Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Defendant
Planet Fitness
Defendant
Vladimir Putin
Defendant
Queen Band
Defendant
Rancho San Antonio County Park
Defendant
Francis Rebsamen
Defendant
Redman
Defendant
Reindeor Entertainment LLC
Defendant
Matteo Renzi
Defendant
Republic of Singapore
Defendant
Rice University
Defendant
Lionel Richie
Defendant
Ring LLC
Defendant
Smokey Robinson
Defendant
Roche Holding AG
Defendant
Rockstar
Defendant
Roman Catholic Diocese of Santa Rosa in California
Defendant
Amber Rose
Defendant
Sacred Heart Cathedral Preparatory
Defendant
Saint-Germain I Auxerrois
Defendant
Saints Peter and Paul Church
Defendant
Katerina Sakellaropoulou
Defendant
San Francisco Symphony
Defendant
Santa Ana, CA
Defendant
Santa Grace in Gerusalemme
Defendant
Carlos Humberto Santana
Defendant
Santo Stephano Island
Defendant
Scale AI
Defendant
Scottish Rites of Freemasonry
Defendant
Hakeem Seriki
Defendant
Sony Music Berlin
Defendant
Sony Music Entertainment UK Ltd.
Defendant
St. Brides Catholic Church
Defendant
St. Brides Major Community Council
Defendant
Star City
Defendant
State of Maryland
Defendant
Stony Mountain Institution
Defendant
Sun City Demoratts Club Georgetown, Texas
Defendant
Surrey County Council
Defendant
Sveriges Riksbank
Defendant
The American Institute of Architects
Defendant
The Cathedral School of St. John the Divine
Defendant
The Church of England
Defendant
The City of Sugar Land
Defendant
The Diocese of Lancaster-England
Defendant
The Letterman Digital Arts Center
Defendant
The Royal Fortress of Saint Francis
Defendant
The St Francis Centre
Defendant
The Waldstadion
Defendant
Trinity Church, Manhattan
Defendant
U.S. Army
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Defendant
United States Postmaster General
Defendant
Veneralde Patriarchal Church of Saint George
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc.
Defendant
Vice Media Group LLC
Defendant
Ville de Quebec
Defendant
Florence Leontine Mary Welch
Defendant
Charlie Wilson
Defendant
World Bank
Defendant
Zapp Band
Defendant
Zeus Digital Theater LLC
Defendant
Zues El Mero Necio
Plaintiff
Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt
12035 S Broadway No. K
Los Angeles, CA 90061


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/30 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. On March 14, 2024, the Court postponed ruling on Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis ("Request") because it failed to provide sufficient information to determine indigency. (Docket Nos.3 ,9 ). The Court requested Plaintiff to refile a fully completed Request or pay the filing fee, and it warned that if she did not comply within 30 days the case would be dismissed without prejudice. (Docket No.9 ). To date, Plaintiff has not responded to the Court's Order. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/30 10:23 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: Although Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, i.e., without legal representation, she nonetheless is required to comply with Court orders, the Local Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 83-2.2.3. The Local Rules are available on the Court's website, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/court-procedures/ local-rules. The Court cannot provide legal advice to any party, including pro se litigants, i.e., parties who are not represented by a lawyer. There is a free "Pro Se Clinic" that can provide information and guidance about many aspects of civil litigation in this Court. The Court notes that a party to this lawsuit does not have a lawyer. Parties in court without a lawyer are called "pro se litigants." These parties often face special challenges in federal court. Public Counsel runs a free Federal Pro Se Clinic where pro se litigants can get information and guidance. The Clinic is located at the Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Pro se litigants must call or submit an on-line application to request services as follows: on-line applications can be submitted at http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/los-angeles, or call (213) 385-2977, ext. 270. Pro se litigants may submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. Only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Documents are submitted in PDF format through an online portal on the Court's website. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. Attorneys are required by the local rules to file documents electronically using the Court's CM/ECF System. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/14 12:29 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)3 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the filer must do the following: (1) Refile a fully completed Request on the Court's CV-60 form, including disclosing all sources of income and their amounts, as well as all assets, and separately addressing the discrepancy above in a statement not to exceed one page; OR (2) Pay the full filing fee of $402. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
8 8 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Tue 01/23 3:25 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:22-cv-08516 CJC(MAR) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, January 18, 2024
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 01/18 9:25 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 01/17 7:00 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/17 6:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/17 6:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 01/17 6:55 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/17 6:53 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 252 pgs cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 01/17 6:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants AT and T Inc., Luis Abinader, AeroSmith, Ambassador of the United States of America to France, Ambassador of the United States to Sweden, Annopolis, Maryland, Atlanta Falcons, Atlanta United 2, Bayer AG, BeeHive Records LLC, Silvio Berlusconi, Bird Global, Inc., Brown University, Buffalo Philharmonic Orchestra, Cathedral of Saint Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral of the Immaculate Conception, Catheral of Christ the King Atlanta, Catholic Health Assoication of the United States of America, Ray Charles, Charleston, South Carolina, China Resources Holdings Company Limited, Christian Church, Christmas Island, Cincinnati Reds, City of Frankfurt, City of Kirksville, Congregation Tfereth Israel, Corona A Station Post Office, Crystal City, Texas, Cystal City, Virginia, Darcus Beese, Deutsche Grammophon, Deutsche Telekom, Christos Dimas, Diocese of Lake Charles, Diocese of Salsona, Dish Network Corporation, Dominoes Pizza, Aubrea Drake Graham, Drakes Seat, DukeKunehan University, Easter Island, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadephia, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Federal Reserve of Atlanta, Federal Reserve of Cleveland, Federal Reserve of Richmond, Isabella Janet Florentina Summers, George Floridis, Fort St Charles, Franciscan Manestery of the Holly Land in America, Franconia, Germany, French Academy in Rome, Galatasaray Sports Club, Genesis Limousine Service, Giardino de Tarocchi, Gold Coast Queenardy, Australia, Good and Drug Administration, Christopher Percy Gordon Blackwell, Hamm, Germany, Steve Harvey, His Majestys Prison and Probation Service, Holy Catholic Catheral of Saint Francis of Aggisi, O Shea Jackson, Sr, Trinidad James, Klaus Johannis, Jurassic World-The Ride, Kane and Abel, Kings County, Victoria La Valle, Lake Charles, Louisiana, Lionsgate Films, Emmanuel Macron, Massacre Island Ontario, Christina Milian, Ministry of Justice, Mission San Francisco de Asis, Monastere de la Grande Chartreuse, Monster, Moses Brown School, New Canaan Community YMCA, Nice, France Town Hall, No Limit Records Inc., Frank Ocean, Old Cathedral of St. Mary of the Immaculated Conception, Opelousas Catholic School, Opera Bastille, Organisation Internatonale de la Francophanie, Joel Osteen, Victoria Osteen, Francesco Patton, Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Planet Fitness, Vladimir Putin, Queen Band, Rancho San Antonio County Park, Francis Rebsamen, Redman, Reindeor Entertainment LLC, Matteo Renzi, Republic of Singapore, Rice University, Lionel Richie, Ring LLC, Smokey Robinson, Roche Holding AG, Rockstar, Roman Catholic Diocese of Santa Rosa in California, Amber Rose, Sacred Heart Cathedral Preparatory, Saint-Germain I Auxerrois, Saints Peter and Paul Church, Katerina Sakellaropoulou, San Francisco Symphony, Santa Ana, CA, Santa Grace in Gerusalemme, Carlos Humberto Santana, Santo Stephano Island, Scale AI, Scottish Rites of Freemasonry, Hakeem Seriki, Sony Music Berlin, Sony Music Entertainment UK Ltd., St. Brides Catholic Church, St. Brides Major Community Council, Star City, State of Maryland, Stony Mountain Institution, Sun City Demoratts Club Georgetown, Texas, Surrey County Council, Sveriges Riksbank, The American Institute of Architects, The Cathedral School of St. John the Divine, The Church of England, The City of Sugar Land, The Diocese of Lancaster-England, The Letterman Digital Arts Center, The Royal Fortress of Saint Francis, The St Francis Centre, The Waldstadion, Trinity Church, Manhattan, U.S. Army, Uber Technologies, Inc., United States Postmaster General, Veneralde Patriarchal Church of Saint George, Verizon Communications, Inc., Vice Media Group LLC, Ville de Quebec, Florence Leontine Mary Welch, Charlie Wilson, World Bank, Zapp Band, Zeus Digital Theater LLC, Zues El Mero Necio.Case assigned to Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet