Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00002
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 19, 2024 2:26 AM EST
defendant
Antonio Darnel Reed (1)
Represented By
Helen C. Nieuwenhuis
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren F. Biksacky
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Austin Jacob Hakes
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Jan 16 2024
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Antonio Darnell Reed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)

Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Antonio Darnell Reed (pjw) Modified text on 1/11/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (pjw) Modified text on 1/11/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Antonio Darnell Reed (pjw) Modified text on 1/11/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]