Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:24-cv-00093
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2024
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
UR M. Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Robert C. Pickren
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Antonio Donis
Director of the Arlington Asylum Office Arlington Asylum Office 1525 Wilson Blvd. Suite 300
Arlington, VA 20529
Represented By
Robert C. Pickren
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Robert C. Pickren
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Taylor
Director of the Washington District Office of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services 2675 Prosperity Avenue
Fairfax, VA 22031
Represented By
Robert C. Pickren
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Robert C. Pickren
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Deniz Babayaka
Represented By
Madeline Nita Taylor Diaz
Taylor Diaz And Soltis PLLC
contact info
Enes Hajdarpasic
Onal Gallant And Partners (nj-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 12, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/12 5:24 PM
ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 4/12/2023. (lcre, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Voluntarily Fri 04/12 11:45 AM
MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Deniz Babayaka. (Taylor Diaz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 03/22 3:53 PM
ORDER that the Motion to Stay re6 ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED. ORDERED that the parties shall submit a status report to this Court one hundred andtwenty (120) days of the entry of this Order indicating whether USCIS has adjudicated Plaintiff'sapplication, and every sixty (60) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 3/22/2024. (lcre, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 motion Stay Tue 03/19 12:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Antonio Donis, UR M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sarah Taylor, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS).(Pickren, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 02/12 7:54 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Enes Hajdarpasic for Deniz Babayaka. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 2/7/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 02/01 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, UR M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sarah Taylor, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/30 3:58 PM
Proposed Summons by Deniz Babayaka. (Taylor Diaz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 3:03 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Enes Hajdarpasic and Certification of Local Counsel Madeline Nita Taylor Diaz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9318410. by Deniz Babayaka. (Taylor Diaz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Thu 01/18 5:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by Deniz Babayaka.(Taylor Diaz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Electronic Fee Payment - 405.00 Fee* Thu 01/18 5:58 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - by Deniz Babayaka. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9316755.. (Taylor Diaz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 01/22 8:54 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Sbro)
Related: [-]