Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-00084
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2024
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 1:33 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Pioneer Square Brands Inc
Represented By
Lawrence Carl Locker
Summit Law Group
contact info
Megan R Wood
Blank Rome Llp (dc)
contact info
Russell T. Wong
Blank Rome Llp (tx)
contact info
Counter Defendant
National Products Inc
Represented By
David K Tellekson
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Jonathan G Tamimi
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Hannah Schae Reid
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Pioneer Square Brands Inc
Represented By
Lawrence Carl Locker
Summit Law Group
contact info
Megan R Wood
Blank Rome Llp (dc)
contact info
Russell T. Wong
Blank Rome Llp (tx)
contact info
Plaintiff
National Products Inc
Represented By
David K Tellekson
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Jonathan G Tamimi
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Hannah Schae Reid
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
32 32 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Wed 06/05 12:51 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CJS) (Main Document 32 replaced on 6/5/2024 to improve pdf image) (CJS)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/05 12:35 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re30 Stipulation. This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs and fees to any party of this case and in accordance with the terms of the confidential settlement agreement dated 5/29/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation Tue 06/04 10:06 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by parties (Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/30 9:00 AM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated per email notice from counsel that this case is settled. Dismissal/Settlement papers due by 6/28/2024. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 05/03 12:49 PM
ANSWER to25 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by National Products Inc.(Tellekson, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/03 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER Setting Pretrial Discovery Schedule and Markman Hearing: Markman Hearing set for 1/17/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Entered at the direction of U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 05/03 10:16 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo- Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft ; Pla Counsel: David Tellekson, Hannah Reid ; Def Counsel: Lawrence Locker, Megan Wood, Russell Wong ; CR: Sheri Schelbert ; Courtroom: Zoom ; Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2024. Court outlines expectations of parties re professionalism, rules and deadlines and adopts the discovery plan and schedule in the parties'23 Joint Status Report. Order to be entered. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/12 1:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Pioneer Square Brands, Inc with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff National Products Inc by Pioneer Square Brands Inc.(Wong, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_GPS 4th Answer to NPI Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2_US App 61943986,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3_US App 14222320,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4_US App 62040037,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5_PCTUS 2015017131,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6_US App 14667564,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7_NOA US App 14667564,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8_US App 14936517,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9_NOA US App 14936517,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10_US App 14941389
24 24 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/12 11:05 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pioneer Square Brands Inc. (Wong, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
23 23 misc Joint Status Report Thu 04/11 4:26 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5 - 7. Filed by Plaintiff National Products Inc.(Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/10 4:22 PM
ORDER granting17 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Date for Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo.(MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
21 21 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 12:05 PM
ORDER re19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Megan R Wood for DEFENDANT Pioneer Square Brands Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
20 20 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 11:20 AM
ORDER re18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Russell T. Wong for DEFENDANT Pioneer Square Brands Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Mon 04/08 11:24 AM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice19 by attorney Megan R. Wood will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
19 19 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 6:07 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Megan R. Wood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Defendants (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8419090 (Locker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 6:04 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Russell T. Wong FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Defendants (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8419082 (Locker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 04/03 2:43 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Date for Scheduling Conference , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 4/3/2024, (Locker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lawrence Carl Locker on behalf of Defendant Pioneer Square Brands Inc. (Locker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/13 9:37 AM
ORDER granting14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The March 14, 2024 deadline for Defendant Pioneer Square Brands Inc. to respond to the complaint is hereby extended by 29 days until April 12, 2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/11 8:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, , filed by Plaintiff National Products Inc. Noting Date 3/12/2024, (Tellekson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
13 13 order DGE - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Tue 02/13 2:50 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/29/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/5/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/02 9:24 AM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Pioneer Square Brands Inc answer due 3/14/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/01 8:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, , filed by Plaintiff National Products Inc. Noting Date 2/1/2024, (Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/29 8:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo for all further proceedings, as related to CV20-428 DGE. (TF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Thu 01/25 4:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pioneer Square Brands Inc. on 1/23/2024, filed by Plaintiff National Products Inc. (Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 01/22 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00428-DGE, by Plaintiff National Products Inc. (Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 01/22 11:16 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Pioneer Square Brands Inc (MIH)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Mon 01/22 10:32 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office (MIH)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 01/22 10:28 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 1/29/2024. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/22 10:11 AM
Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hannah Schae Reid on behalf of Plaintiff National Products Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Hannah
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan G Tamimi on behalf of Plaintiff National Products Inc.. (Tamimi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 01/18 6:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by National Products Inc.. (Tellekson, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/18 6:14 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against defendant(s) Pioneer Square Brands Inc. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney David K Tellekson added to party National Products Inc.(pty:pla) filed by National Products Inc..(Tellekson, David)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8317701
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)