New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:24-cv-00407
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Doe Defendants
Defendant
The 3M Company
Represented By
Jordan David Sagalowsky
Mayer Brown Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC,
Defendant
The Chemours Company,
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemguard Inc.
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Chemdesign Products Inc.
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Plaintiff
Monya Ray
Plaintiff
Shelvin Stackhouse
Plaintiff
Jason Polittle
Plaintiff
Adrian Phillips
Plaintiff
Linda Pettiford
Plaintiff
Matthew Parks
Plaintiff
Jennifer Palmer
Plaintiff
Lynn OQuinn
Plaintiff
Albert North
Plaintiff
George Mitchell
Plaintiff
Patricia Minietta
Plaintiff
Michael Miller
Plaintiff
Andrew Robert
Plaintiff
Vickie Saunders
Plaintiff
Augustus Snipes
Plaintiff
Richard Solis
Plaintiff
Deborah Stewart
Plaintiff
Darrell Tamayo
Plaintiff
Ralph Wilson
Plaintiff
Michael White
Plaintiff
David Way
Plaintiff
Cecil Washington
Plaintiff
Della Wagnon
Plaintiff
David Wade
Plaintiff
Kenneth Duchateau
Plaintiff
Marshall Bacot
Plaintiff
Devin Barthold
Plaintiff
Robert Bates
Plaintiff
Deborah Berry
Plaintiff
Cornelius Brown
Plaintiff
Rebecca Brown
Plaintiff
Rita Brown
Plaintiff
Fredrick Bulter
Plaintiff
Ronald Carter Reed
Plaintiff
Deborah Curtis
Plaintiff
Kim Delong
Plaintiff
Tommy Dennard
Plaintiff
Kenneth Dillon
Plaintiff
Gregory Douglas
Plaintiff
William McComb
Plaintiff
Rose Edwards
Plaintiff
Donald Ervin
Plaintiff
Jimmy Eugene Goodwin
Plaintiff
Asuncion Fisher
Plaintiff
Scott Gage
Plaintiff
Cecil Gragg
Plaintiff
Robert Hendren
Plaintiff
Timothy Hill
Plaintiff
Robert Hunt
Plaintiff
Kenneth Ivey
Plaintiff
Juliana Joseph-Tanner
Plaintiff
Michael Laudati
Plaintiff
Ramon Luciano, Jr.
Plaintiff
Scott Mayfield
Plaintiff
Raymond Mays


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Tue 02/13 12:59 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:24-cv-00609, filed on 2/6/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
5 5 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Tue 02/06 5:32 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer MDL Transfer Out Tue 02/06 5:34 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/29 10:48 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/29/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 01/25 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 01/19 11:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF ( Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours Inc., E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP (in their INDIVIDUAL capacity)). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 01/19 11:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 01/19 11:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/19 11:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Fri 01/19 2:38 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Marshall Bacot, Devin Barthold, Robert Bates, Deborah Berry, Cornelius Brown, Rita Brown, Rebecca Brown, Fredrick Bulter, Ronald Carter Reed, Deborah Curtis, Kim Delong, Tommy Dennard, Kenneth Dillon, Gregory Douglas, Kenneth Duchateau, Rose Edwards, Donald Ervin, Jimmy Eugene Goodwin, Asuncion Fisher, Scott Gage, Cecil Gragg, Robert Hendren, Timothy Hill, Robert Hunt, Kenneth Ivey, Juliana Joseph-Tanner, Michael Laudati, Ramon Luciano, Jr, Scott Mayfield, Raymond Mays, William McComb, Michael Miller, Patricia Minietta, George Mitchell, Albert North, Lynn OQuinn, Jennifer Palmer, Matthew Parks, Linda Pettiford, Adrian Phillips, Jason Polittle, Monya Ray, Andrew Robert, Vickie Saunders, Augustus Snipes, Richard Solis, Shelvin Stackhouse, Deborah Stewart, Darrell Tamayo, David Wade, Della Wagnon, Cecil Washington, David Way, Michael White, Ralph Wilson added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal.Document filed by The 3M Company. Related document:1 Notice of Removal..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Fri 01/19 2:47 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Marshall Bacot, Devin Barthold, Robert Bates, Deborah Berry, Cornelius Brown, Rita Brown, Rebecca Brown, Fredrick Bulter, Ronald Carter Reed, Deborah Curtis, Kim Delong, Tommy Dennard, Kenneth Dillon, Gregory Douglas, Kenneth Duchateau, Rose Edwards, Donald Ervin, Jimmy Eugene Goodwin, Asuncion Fisher, Scott Gage, Cecil Gragg, Robert Hendren, Timothy Hill, Robert Hunt, Kenneth Ivey, Juliana Joseph-Tanner, Michael Laudati, Ramon Luciano, Jr, Scott Mayfield, Raymond Mays, William McComb, Michael Miller, Patricia Minietta, George Mitchell, Albert North, Lynn OQuinn, Jennifer Palmer, Matthew Parks, Linda Pettiford, Adrian Phillips, Jason Polittle, Monya Ray, Andrew Robert, Vickie Saunders, Augustus Snipes, Richard Solis, Shelvin Stackhouse, Deborah Stewart, Darrell Tamayo, David Wade, Della Wagnon, Cecil Washington, David Way, Michael White, Ralph Wilson added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal.Document filed by The 3M Company, E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company,, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, DuPont De Nemours Inc., The Chemours Company FC, LLC,. Related document:1 Notice of Removal..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/18 9:44 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/18 9:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/18 9:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161500/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28830085).Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint