FULLER et al v. Jefferson County, Colorado
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Domenico |
Referred: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00157 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 49:47101 - Airport & Airway Improvement Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 2:17 AM MDT |
Defendant
Jefferson County, Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARIA KOUZMINA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HONG LI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZHUXIAO LI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JING LU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HONGYAN LUO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRITTANY NEIL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ETHAN NEIL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AUSTIN NORAUSKY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KOZUE NORAUSKY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYAN F. O'LEARY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANCES O'LEARY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BONNIE J. PARACHINI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS J. PARACHINI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH ANN PARADY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRITT-ANNE PARKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANK PARKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER S. PEACOCK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMY P. PEDRUCCI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARC PEDRUCCI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC S. PELTIER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SARAH PELTIER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TARA PELTIER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONNA S. PENDLETON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN J. PENDLETON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE A. PESA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARBARA J. PESKIND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNALISSA PHILBIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KARA MARIE PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BETH PLOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER PLOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL PRIDDY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID PUJDAK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN PUJDAK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YONGHAI QIAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AZALEE RAFII
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LI REN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN C. RESCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARGARET T. RESCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IV JOHN LEE REYNOLDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARYELLEN F. REZVAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY A. REZVAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRANNON H. RICHARDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LANA P. RICHARDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA ROCKWAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ROCKWAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY A. RUND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK J. RUND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL SALIMBENE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MANISHA SANGVIKAR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SACHIN SANGVIKAR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALICE C. SANTMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOEL DAVID SAYRES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARTHA J. SCHELER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELANIE SCHIEFFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANE SCHIEFFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW L. SCHIFLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BLAKE SCHMIDT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN T. SCHMIDT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA B. SCOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORI B. SCOTT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN M. SEIGEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL J. SHAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAN SHI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW W. SIEGMUND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SURAJ SINGH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN W. STANTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RACHEL E. STANTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN TAYLOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDSEY TAYLOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY THOMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KRISTY THOMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRACY L. TROCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER F. TUEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOYCE UHLENHAKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHAWN UHLENHAKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PRABHU VELAYUTHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORBERT VER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM VONNAHME
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SARAH VONNAHME
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JIAN WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUNGANG WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
QI WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WEI WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
XI WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YIYUAN WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK JAMES WEIDNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID WEINGARDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHELE WEINGARDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JILL L. WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOEL WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN WHITMORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZOE WHITMORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN WILCOX
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA L. WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KYLE L. WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MINMING WU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MING XIE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHAN YECKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
XIAOJUN YIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER G. YORK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBYN C. YORK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANN MARIE YOUNCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL R. YOUNCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA E. YOUNG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WEIPING ZHAO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
XIAOWEI ZHENG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUANJUAN ZHU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason C. Abair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Robert Alread
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Peter Andersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Elizabeth Andersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Schiel Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Grady Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirsi A. Aulin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon David Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Dawn Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colin R. Baukol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura E. Baukol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie J. Bird
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Louis Bird
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Bisaillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Paul Bisaillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles J. Blakely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda D. Blakely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalie T. Boezaart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodoor P. Boezaart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Bouchard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milena Bouchard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather C. Boudreau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Boutelle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachael S. Bray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brogden-Huot Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale T. Brotski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leanne Brotski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shana Burack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith A. Buschmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Callipari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Callipari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lihua Cao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick T. Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tricia A. Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zhongming Chen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yifan Cheng
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Cibelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Citarella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Clymer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrill Clymer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn E. Conklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert R. Conklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert W. Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margo Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric D. Cosmos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy T. Crist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard W. Crist, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esa Crumb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yinan Deng
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergey I. Derevyanko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew S. Dew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine M. Dierking
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd R. Dierking
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Dimaio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Dimaio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiaoyun Ding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Dionne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Dionne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher James Drummond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Kay Drummond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karin Y. Dudek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew S. Dudek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia E. Dunham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean M. Dunham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Durand Living Trust, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Edmonston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Edmonston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edmund Eissenstat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannine Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Erekson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Erekson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen M. Falardeau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xia Fang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huilin Feng
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Flach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stefanie Flach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Flood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Flood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Marie Fordney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Fuller Fordney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher R. Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenny R. Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew James Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Jean Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Frutig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew Phillip Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannah Jo Fuller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Galerstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anup Gandhi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yuefeng Gao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Garner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph C. Gogain, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gospodarek Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise T. Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery E. Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claire M. Greening
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Greening
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber N. Greves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Groelz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Groelz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy E. Gross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven C. Gross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candice J. Grubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory G. Grubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Shouyi Gu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Youfan Gu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kati Marianna Guerrero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Gussenbauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Gussenbauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa-Marie Gustofson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gustofson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oumnia Reghai Haddad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zaid Haddad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yongxin Han
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nimisha Sinha Hanks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas W. Hanks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy David Hanks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Hauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peiqi He
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tao He
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John R. Heckman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Heckman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lacey Hedin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Hedin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saul Herbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Andrew Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore J. Hillestad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whitney R. Hillestad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Himmelberger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Himmelberger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David A. Hodgson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura M. Hodgson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rochelle M. Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica N. Hoover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan D. Hoover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James P. Howe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole C. Howe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alison B. Hubbard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JZYV Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia A. James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vidya Jayakar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebekah Jayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert B. Jayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Leanne Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Ramsey Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsay H. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark A. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan E. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen A. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon E. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordaan Family Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Piyush Ramesh Kansara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Purvi Piyush Kansara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morteza Karimzadeh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nikita Kataria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lara Katzin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Katzin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George D. Kellogg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Kemp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary E. Kemp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy J. Kenkel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Prema Khanna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Kiehling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Kiehling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Duncan Knott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Aubry Komin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie A. Kraft
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David F. Krenik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dena M. Krenik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erik Kreuger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kasia Kreuger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karvin R. Kuffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cuo Lan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie M. Landin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd P. Landin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kellie Lange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Lange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shandong Lao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn A. Lasker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan L. Lasker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle D. Leese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey L. Leese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica N. Leibovitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael B. Leibovitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anne-Laure Lepere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Lepere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hui Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haidao Lin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ying Lin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Listecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarissa W. Liu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Song Liu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Lord
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tami Lord
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael A. Maciszewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle L. Maciszewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivy L. Maday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean D. Maday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather N. Malm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Matz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maximiano Hynson Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda McCluskey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connor McCluskey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristen McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda L. Medine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan A. Medine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael D. Lynn Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
H. Alexander Mikishko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly E. Millett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John R. Mitton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn M. Mitton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Ann Moffett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Duncan Moffett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lars K. Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcela J. Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen M. Moriarty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra J. Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Lee Myers, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yen Lin Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alice Penton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elena Polovnikova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gang Qian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda C. Lynn Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta Schilling-Gogain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiaoyan Shi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika Lin Stensvaag
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yifeng Tian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Na Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yan Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xue Wei
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Binxin Xing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yingxin Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yongxin Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lihua Zhong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Request for Certificate of Good Standing
Mon 08/26 10:25 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bryan Patrick Rose (51608) $21, receipt number ACODC-9841402. Address to email certificate:derek.bernhard@stinson.com. 6/5/2018 NOTE: Your certificate will be emailed to the designated email after verification and processing. (Rose, Bryan) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/24 10:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service by email by Clerk of Court re 40 Order to the Boulder County District Court. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Mon 06/24 9:57 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to ECF 40 on 21 June 2026. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/21 6:11 PM
ORDER adopting39 RECOMMENDATION. United States Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak recommends that I grant the Plaintiffs motion, Doc.20 , to remand this case to state court. As no objections have been filed, I have reviewed the recommendation to satisfy myself that there is no clear error on the face of the record. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b) Advisory Committee Notes. Based on that review, I have concluded that the recommendation is a correct application of the facts and the law. As Judge Varholak determined, there is no federal question presented on the face of the Plaintiffs Complaint, the complete preemption doctrine does not apply, and this matter was improperly removed to federal court because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Judge Varholak was also correct to determine that this Court should not act on the pending motions to dismiss and consolidate as this court lacks jurisdiction to do so. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation of Judge Varholak, Doc.39 , is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED; The Plaintiffs Motion for Remand, Doc.20 , is GRANTED; and This case is remanded to the District Court of the County of Boulder, Colorado. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/21/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc9, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the20 Motion to Remand be GRANTED and that the24 Motion to Dismiss and the32 Motion to Consolidate Cases not be acted upon by this Court but instead be decided by the District Court of the County of Boulder, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/4/2024. (schap, ) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak: on 5/20/2024. ORDERED: Defendants Motion to Consolidate32 is TAKENUNDER ADVISEMENT and the court will be issuing a recommendation. FTR: A402. (morti,) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() REPLY to Response to32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado.(Vasquez, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() RESPONSE to32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere. (Sperber, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Minute Order
Thu 04/11 3:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court pursuant to conversation between Chambers and the parties. The Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2024 is VACATED and RESET for 5/20/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/11/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) |
|
34 | 34
order
Minute Order
Thu 04/11 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on32 Defendant's Motion to Consolidate (the "Motion"). Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before 4/25/2024. Defendant may reply on or before 5/2/2024. A Motion Hearing on the Motion is set for 5/16/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/11/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 04/11 9:22 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jefferson County, Colorado. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/11/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc9, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado.(Vasquez, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado (Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() REPLY to Response to20 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere. (Sperber, John) |
|
29 | 29
![]() REPLY to Response to24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado. (Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() RESPONSE to24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere.(Sperber, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() RESPONSE to20 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado.(Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 02/21 4:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jefferson County, Colorado. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/21/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/21/2024. ORDERED: The Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand15 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks a stay of all discovery but it is denied to the extent it seeks to stay briefing on the motion to dismiss and the court will allow that briefing to continue. If the Motion for Remand and the Motion to Dismiss are denied, the parties shall contact Magistrate Varholaks chambers within five (5) days of those rulings to set the matter for a Scheduling Conference. The Status Conference set for March 13, 2024 is VACATED. FTR: A402. (morti,) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado.(Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minute Order
Fri 02/16 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER A Motion Hearing is set for 2/21/2024 02:45 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, at which time the Court will take up15 Motion to Stay. The briefing on20 Motion to Remand shall follow the schedule set forth at D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/16/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 02/16 10:20 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: 15 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; AND 20 Motion to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/16/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() REPLY to Response to15 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere. (Sperber, John) |
|
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere. (Sperber, John) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE to15 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado. (Goldberg, Milton) |
|
18 | 18
![]() MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/8/2024. A further Status Conference is set for 3/13/2024 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: A402. (morti, ) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean J. Metherell by Sean Jeremy Metherell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Jeremy Metherell added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla) (Metherell, Sean) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado All parties do not consent.. (Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Amy E. Gross, Steven C. Gross, Candice J. Grubb, Gregory G. Grubb, Gordon Shouyi Gu, Youfan Gu, Kati Marianna Guerrero, Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba, Marc Gussenbauer, Michelle Gussenbauer, BRIAN C. RESCH, MARGARET T. RESCH, COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS, JOHN LEE REYNOLDS, MARYELLEN F. REZVAN, TIMOTHY A. REZVAN, BRANNON H. RICHARDS, LANA P. RICHARDS, RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE, BRITT-ANNE PARKER, FRANK PARKER, JENNIFER S. PEACOCK, AMY P. PEDRUCCI, MARC PEDRUCCI, ERIC S. PELTIER, SARAH PELTIER, TARA PELTIER, DONNA S. PENDLETON, KEVIN J. PENDLETON, Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam, Joseph C. Gogain, Jr, Gospodarek Family Trust, Denise T. Greene, Jeffery E. Greene, Claire M. Greening, Michael J. Greening, Amber N. Greves, Melissa Groelz, Ryan Groelz, Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust, Eric D. Cosmos, Nancy T. Crist, Richard W. Crist, III, Esa Crumb, Danielle Davis, Yinan Deng, Sergey I. Derevyanko, Matthew S. Dew, Katherine M. Dierking, DAVID PUJDAK, SUSAN PUJDAK, Alice Penton, Elena Polovnikova, YONGHAI QIAN, BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY, MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY, Gang Qian, AZALEE RAFII, LI REN, Daniel Himmelberger, David A. Hodgson, Laura M. Hodgson, Rochelle M. Hoffman, Jessica N. Hoover, Jonathan D. Hoover, James P. Howe, Nicole C. Howe, Alison B. Hubbard, Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust, Erika Lin Stensvaag, BRIAN TAYLOR, LINDSEY TAYLOR, CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ, CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ, THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST, JEFFREY THOMPSON, KRISTY THOMPSON, TRACY L. TROCH, JENNIFER F. TUEY, GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE, JESSICA ROCKWAY, MICHAEL ROCKWAY, KIMBERLY A. RUND, MARK J. RUND, Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust, Rhonda C. Lynn Trust, DANIEL SALIMBENE, GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT, MANISHA SANGVIKAR, Hui Li, Haidao Lin, Ying Lin, Kristin Listecki, Clarissa W. Liu, Song Liu, Steve Lord, Tami Lord, Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust, Michael A. Maciszewski, JACQUELINE A. PESA, BARBARA J. PESKIND, ANNALISSA PHILBIN, ADAM PHILLIPS, KARA MARIE PHILLIPS, ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, BETH PLOTT, CHRISTOPHER PLOTT, MICHAEL PRIDDY, JZYV Revocable Trust, Clayton James, Patricia A. James, Vidya Jayakar, Rebekah Jayne, Robert B. Jayne, Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust, Andrea Leanne Jenkins, Jason Ramsey Jenkins, Jason C. Abair, Amy Alexander, Daniel Allen, Lisa Allen, Joseph Robert Alread, Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The, Christian Peter Andersen, Heather Elizabeth Andersen, Jamie Schiel Arnold, Peter Grady Arnold, Jenny R. Fox, Andrew James Frazier, Kelly Jean Frazier, Brian Frutig, Drew Phillip Fuller, Hannah Jo Fuller, William Galerstein, Anup Gandhi, Yuefeng Gao, Dawn Garner, Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The, Lindsay H. Johnson, Mark A. Johnson, Jonathan E. Jones, Karen A. Jones, Shannon E. Jones, Jordaan Family Revocable Trust, MARIA KOUZMINA, Piyush Ramesh Kansara, Purvi Piyush Kansara, John R. Mitton, Lynn M. Mitton, Julia Ann Moffett, Kyle Duncan Moffett, Lars K. Morales, Marcela J. Morales, Kathleen M. Moriarty, Sandra J. Morrison, Anthony Lee Myers, Jr, Yen Lin Myers, Karen M. Falardeau, Xia Fang, Huilin Feng, Adam Flach, Stefanie Flach, Kathryn Flood, Michael Flood, Jennifer Marie Fordney, Mark Fuller Fordney, Christopher R. Fox, Karvin R. Kuffer, Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram, HONG LI, ZHUXIAO LI, JING LU, HONGYAN LUO, Cuo Lan, Carrie M. Landin, Todd P. Landin, Kellie Lange, Kirsi A. Aulin, Brandon David Barber, Heather Dawn Barber, Colin R. Baukol, Laura E. Baukol, Bonnie J. Bird, Randall Louis Bird, Anna Bisaillon, Shawn Paul Bisaillon, Charles J. Blakely, Kristen McCormick, Jay McMahon, Sarah McMahon, Amanda L. Medine, Ryan A. Medine, Michael D. Lynn Trust, Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The, Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The, H. Alexander Mikishko, Molly E. Millett, Leanne Brotski, Shana Burack, Keith A. Buschmann, Crystal Callipari, Marc Callipari, Lihua Cao, Derrick T. Carpenter, Tricia A. Carpenter, Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust, Zhongming Chen, Linda D. Blakely, Rosalie T. Boezaart, Theodoor P. Boezaart, Brian Bouchard, Milena Bouchard, Heather C. Boudreau, Robert Boutelle, Rachael S. Bray, Brogden-Huot Living Trust, Dale T. Brotski, Lisa-Marie Gustofson, Robert Gustofson, Oumnia Reghai Haddad, Zaid Haddad, Yongxin Han, Nimisha Sinha Hanks, Thomas W. Hanks, Timothy David Hanks, Peter Hauer, Peiqi He, Michelle L. Maciszewski, Ivy L. Maday, Sean D. Maday, Heather N. Malm, Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust, Rachel Matz, Maximiano Hynson Living Trust, Amanda McCluskey, Connor McCluskey, John McCormick, Morteza Karimzadeh, Nikita Kataria, Lara Katzin, Marc Katzin, George D. Kellogg, Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg, Brian Kemp, Mary E. Kemp, Timothy J. Kenkel, Sarah Kennedy, NATHAN YECKE, XIAOJUN YIN, CHRISTOPHER G. YORK, ROBYN C. YORK, ANN MARIE YOUNCE, MICHAEL R. YOUNCE, ANDREA E. YOUNG, WEIPING ZHAO, XIAOWEI ZHENG, JUANJUAN ZHU, Patricia E. Dunham, Sean M. Dunham, Durand Living Trust, The, Christopher Edmonston, Victoria Edmonston, Edmund Eissenstat, Brian Elliott, Jeannine Elliott, Brittany Erekson, Spencer Erekson, Prema Khanna, Andrew Kiehling, Jessica Kiehling, Brian Duncan Knott, Taylor Aubry Komin, Julie A. Kraft, David F. Krenik, Dena M. Krenik, Erik Kreuger, Kasia Kreuger, RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN, BRITTANY NEIL, ETHAN NEIL, AUSTIN NORAUSKY, KOZUE NORAUSKY, BRYAN F. O'LEARY, FRANCES O'LEARY, BONNIE J. PARACHINI, THOMAS J. PARACHINI, ELIZABETH ANN PARADY, SACHIN SANGVIKAR, ALICE C. SANTMAN, JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN, STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN, JOEL DAVID SAYRES, MARTHA J. SCHELER, MELANIE SCHIEFFER, SHANE SCHIEFFER, ANDREW L. SCHIFLE, BLAKE SCHMIDT, SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST, ANDREW W. SIEGMUND, SURAJ SINGH, KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM, JOHN W. STANTON, RACHEL E. STANTON, STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST, SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM, Marta Schilling-Gogain, Xiaoyan Shi, SUSAN T. SCHMIDT, BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER, JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ, STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ, JOSHUA B. SCOTT, LORI B. SCOTT, SUSAN M. SEIGEL, DANIEL J. SHAY, RAN SHI, Tao He, John R. Heckman, Patricia Heckman, Lacey Hedin, Nathan Hedin, Saul Herbert, Brian Andrew Hicks, Theodore J. Hillestad, Whitney R. Hillestad, Andrea Himmelberger, Todd R. Dierking, Jeffrey Dimaio, Rebecca Dimaio, Xiaoyun Ding, Laura Dionne, Ryan Dionne, Christopher James Drummond, Sarah Kay Drummond, Karin Y. Dudek, Matthew S. Dudek, WEI WANG, XI WANG, YIYUAN WANG, BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER, MARK JAMES WEIDNER, DAVID WEINGARDEN, MICHELE WEINGARDEN, JILL L. WHITE, JOEL WHITE, BRIAN WHITMORE, Yifan Cheng, Tara Cibelli, Michael Citarella, Dustin Clymer, Terrill Clymer, Lynn E. Conklin, Robert R. Conklin, Laurie Cook, Robert W. Cook, Margo Cooper, Yifeng Tian, JOYCE UHLENHAKE, SHAWN UHLENHAKE, PRABHU VELAYUTHAM, NORBERT VER, ADAM VONNAHME, SARAH VONNAHME, JIAN WANG, JUNGANG WANG, QI WANG, Yingxin Zhang, Yongxin Zhang, Lihua Zhong, ZOE WHITMORE, SEAN WILCOX, JESSICA L. WILLIAMS, KYLE L. WILLIAMS, MINMING WU, Na Wang, Yan Wang, Xue Wei, MING XIE, Binxin Xing, Zachary Lange, Shandong Lao, Carolyn A. Lasker, Jonathan L. Lasker, Michelle D. Leese, Tracey L. Leese, Erica N. Leibovitz, Michael B. Leibovitz, Anne-Laure Lepere, Gregory Lepere. (Sperber, John) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael J. Hirak by Michael Joseph Hirak on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Hirak added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla) (Hirak, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 01/24 12:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint on or before March 1, 2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/24/2024. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minute Order
Tue 01/23 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of the docket. A Status Conference is set for 2/8/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/23/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of John R. Sperber by John Richard Sperber on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amy E. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Steven C. Gross(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Candice J. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gregory G. Grubb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gordon Shouyi Gu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Youfan Gu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kati Marianna Guerrero(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Cesar Augusto Guerrero Cordoba(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle Gussenbauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN C. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARGARET T. RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party COURTNEY KEISTER REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOHN LEE REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARYELLEN F. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TIMOTHY A. REZVAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRANNON H. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LANA P. RICHARDS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RIVINUS FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER J. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRITT-ANNE PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party FRANK PARKER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JENNIFER S. PEACOCK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AMY P. PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARC PEDRUCCI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ERIC S. PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SARAH PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TARA PELTIER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DONNA S. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KEVIN J. PENDLETON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brook Z. Gebre-Mariam(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Joseph C. Gogain, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gospodarek Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Denise T. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffery E. Greene(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Claire M. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael J. Greening(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amber N. Greves(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Melissa Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan Groelz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Corey & Becky Ochsner Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Eric D. Cosmos(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nancy T. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Richard W. Crist, III(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Esa Crumb(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Danielle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yinan Deng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sergey I. Derevyanko(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Matthew S. Dew(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Katherine M. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DAVID PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN PUJDAK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alice Penton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Elena Polovnikova(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party YONGHAI QIAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN JON QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARY ELIZABETH QUESENBERRY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gang Qian(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AZALEE RAFII(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LI REN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Daniel Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party David A. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura M. Hodgson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rochelle M. Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jessica N. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan D. Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party James P. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nicole C. Howe(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alison B. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Inga Claire Dixon Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erika Lin Stensvaag(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LINDSEY TAYLOR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTIAN R. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTINA L. TENEROWICZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party THE SARAH M. ZABEL REVOCABLE TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JEFFREY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KRISTY THOMPSON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party TRACY L. TROCH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JENNIFER F. TUEY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party GABRIELLE L. ROBBIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JESSICA ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL ROCKWAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KIMBERLY A. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARK J. RUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Renee & Gregory Alaniz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rhonda C. Lynn Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DANIEL SALIMBENE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party GEOFFREY R. SANDFORT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MANISHA SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hui Li(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Haidao Lin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ying Lin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kristin Listecki(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Clarissa W. Liu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Song Liu(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Steve Lord(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tami Lord(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lucie Guyot Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael A. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JACQUELINE A. PESA(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BARBARA J. PESKIND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANNALISSA PHILBIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ADAM PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KARA MARIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ROBERT GATES PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BETH PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER PLOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL PRIDDY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JZYV Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Clayton James(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia A. James(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Vidya Jayakar(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rebekah Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert B. Jayne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffrey C. Zabel Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrea Leanne Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jason Ramsey Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jason C. Abair(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amy Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Daniel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lisa Allen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Joseph Robert Alread(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Alyssa Whitcraft Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christian Peter Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather Elizabeth Andersen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jamie Schiel Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peter Grady Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jenny R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrew James Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kelly Jean Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Frutig(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Drew Phillip Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hannah Jo Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party William Galerstein(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anup Gandhi(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yuefeng Gao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dawn Garner(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeremy Mirmelstein Revocable Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lindsay H. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mark A. Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karen A. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shannon E. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jordaan Family Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARIA KOUZMINA(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Piyush Ramesh Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Purvi Piyush Kansara(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John R. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lynn M. Mitton(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Julia Ann Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kyle Duncan Moffett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lars K. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marcela J. Morales(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kathleen M. Moriarty(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sandra J. Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anthony Lee Myers, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yen Lin Myers(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karen M. Falardeau(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xia Fang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Huilin Feng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Adam Flach(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Stefanie Flach(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kathryn Flood(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael Flood(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jennifer Marie Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mark Fuller Fordney(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher R. Fox(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karvin R. Kuffer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jai Kumaran Kuppuswamy Cancheevaram(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party HONG LI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ZHUXIAO LI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JING LU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party HONGYAN LUO(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Cuo Lan(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Carrie M. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Todd P. Landin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kellie Lange(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kirsi A. Aulin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brandon David Barber(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather Dawn Barber(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Colin R. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura E. Baukol(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Bonnie J. Bird(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Randall Louis Bird(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anna Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shawn Paul Bisaillon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Charles J. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kristen McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jay McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah McMahon(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amanda L. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan A. Medine(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael D. Lynn Trust (pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael J. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle V. Gazarik Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party H. Alexander Mikishko(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Molly E. Millett(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Leanne Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shana Burack(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Keith A. Buschmann(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Crystal Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Callipari(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lihua Cao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Derrick T. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tricia A. Carpenter(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Chad & Darcey Sypolt Revocable Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zhongming Chen(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Linda D. Blakely(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rosalie T. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Theodoor P. Boezaart(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Milena Bouchard(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather C. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert Boutelle(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rachael S. Bray(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brogden-Huot Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dale T. Brotski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lisa-Marie Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert Gustofson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Oumnia Reghai Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zaid Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yongxin Han(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nimisha Sinha Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Thomas W. Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Timothy David Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peter Hauer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Peiqi He(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle L. Maciszewski(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ivy L. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sean D. Maday(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Heather N. Malm(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc & Lindsey Morris Gutman Rev Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rachel Matz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Maximiano Hynson Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Amanda McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Connor McCluskey(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John McCormick(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Morteza Karimzadeh(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nikita Kataria(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lara Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marc Katzin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party George D. Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Hillary Nussbaum Kellogg(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Mary E. Kemp(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Timothy J. Kenkel(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party NATHAN YECKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XIAOJUN YIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party CHRISTOPHER G. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ROBYN C. YORK(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANN MARIE YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHAEL R. YOUNCE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREA E. YOUNG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party WEIPING ZHAO(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XIAOWEI ZHENG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUANJUAN ZHU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia E. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sean M. Dunham(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Durand Living Trust, The(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Victoria Edmonston(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Edmund Eissenstat(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeannine Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brittany Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Spencer Erekson(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Prema Khanna(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrew Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jessica Kiehling(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Duncan Knott(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Taylor Aubry Komin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Julie A. Kraft(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party David F. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dena M. Krenik(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erik Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Kasia Kreuger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RAJALAKSHMI NATARAJAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRITTANY NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ETHAN NEIL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party AUSTIN NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KOZUE NORAUSKY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRYAN F. O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party FRANCES O'LEARY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BONNIE J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party THOMAS J. PARACHINI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ELIZABETH ANN PARADY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SACHIN SANGVIKAR(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ALICE C. SANTMAN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUSTIN RICHARD SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEPHANIE ERIN SATIN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOEL DAVID SAYRES(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARTHA J. SCHELER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MELANIE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHANE SCHIEFFER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREW L. SCHIFLE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BLAKE SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHUAIHANG WANG AND ANDREW AUDIBERT LIVING TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ANDREW W. SIEGMUND(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SURAJ SINGH(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KAVITHA SOMASUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOHN W. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RACHEL E. STANTON(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEVE & MERRY WOLF TRUST(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SOMASUNDARAM SUNDARAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Marta Schilling-Gogain(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xiaoyan Shi(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN T. SCHMIDT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BENJAMIN SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ELIZABETH SCHNEIDER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JACLYN MARIE SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party STEVEN JAMES SCHULTZ(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOSHUA B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party LORI B. SCOTT(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SUSAN M. SEIGEL(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DANIEL J. SHAY(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party RAN SHI(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tao He(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party John R. Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Patricia Heckman(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lacey Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Nathan Hedin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Saul Herbert(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Brian Andrew Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Theodore J. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Whitney R. Hillestad(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Andrea Himmelberger(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Todd R. Dierking(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jeffrey Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Rebecca Dimaio(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xiaoyun Ding(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laura Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Ryan Dionne(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Christopher James Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Sarah Kay Drummond(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Karin Y. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Matthew S. Dudek(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party WEI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party XI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party YIYUAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIDGETT ANNE WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MARK JAMES WEIDNER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party DAVID WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MICHELE WEINGARDEN(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JILL L. WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOEL WHITE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party BRIAN WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yifan Cheng(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tara Cibelli(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael Citarella(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Dustin Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Terrill Clymer(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lynn E. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert R. Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Laurie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Robert W. Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Margo Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yifeng Tian(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JOYCE UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SHAWN UHLENHAKE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party PRABHU VELAYUTHAM(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party NORBERT VER(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ADAM VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SARAH VONNAHME(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JIAN WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JUNGANG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party QI WANG(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yingxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yongxin Zhang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Lihua Zhong(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party ZOE WHITMORE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party SEAN WILCOX(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party JESSICA L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party KYLE L. WILLIAMS(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MINMING WU(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Na Wang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Yan Wang(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Xue Wei(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party MING XIE(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Binxin Xing(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Zachary Lange(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Shandong Lao(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Carolyn A. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Jonathan L. Lasker(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michelle D. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Tracey L. Leese(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Erica N. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Michael B. Leibovitz(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Anne-Laure Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla), Attorney John Richard Sperber added to party Gregory Lepere(pty:pla) (Sperber, John) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/22 2:02 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/22/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Jefferson County, Colorado.(Vasquez, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathaniel T. Vasquez on behalf of Jefferson County, ColoradoAttorney Nathaniel T. Vasquez added to party Jefferson County, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel T. Vasquez added to party Jefferson County, Colorado(pty:dft) (Vasquez, Nathaniel) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (blaws) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 01/22 1:43 PM
Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
7 | 7
![]() STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, by Robert G. Gunning, District Court Judge, Boulder County, on 01/11/2024. (blaws) |
|
6 | 6
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Jefferson County, Colorado on 12/27/2023. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
![]() STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Jefferson County, Colorado, filed by all Plaintiffs. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Mon 01/22 1:28 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson County, Colorado , Based on Federal Question Jurisdiction, from District Court, Boulder County, CO, Case Number 2023CV031075. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9493480), filed by Jefferson County, Colorado.(Goldberg, Milton) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |