California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-70038
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 18, 2024 11:46 PM PST
Defendant
David Scott Cacchione (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Garth Hire
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 4:45 AM PST
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
1 1 16 pgs COMPLAINT as to David Scott Cacchione (1). (mjj2, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/17/2024 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Complaint by USA as to David Scott Cacchione. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Complaint as to David Scott Cacchione (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 1/12/2024. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING as to David Scott Cacchione. Initial Appearance set for 1/17/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]