New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-04010
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 19, 2024 2:23 AM EST
Defendant
Elijah Adams (1)
Represented By
Kathryn S. Austin
Federal Public Defender'S Office For The Western Distri
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert Marangola
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Rochester
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2024 3:12 AM EST
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
Arrest of Elijah Adams (LMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Elijah Adams (1). (LMD)
Related: [-]
2 2 Attorney update in case as to Elijah Adams. Attorney Kathryn S. Austin for Elijah Adams added. (LMD)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Appearances: Def. w/ Kathryn Austin, AFPD; Robert Marangola, AUSA and Kristen Nenni, POA. Initial Appearance as to Elijah Adams held on 1/17/2024. Def. request court appointed counsel. Court appoints Kathyrn Austin after reviewing the financial affidavit. Def. advised of rights. Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P 5(f), the Court ordered the government to produce all exculpatory evidence pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny and advised that failure to do so could result in consequences, including sanctions and contempt proceedings. Government moves for detention on both dangerousness and risk of flight Detention Hearing set for 1/24/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Government will provide discovery to the defense. (FTR Recording.) (LMD)
Related: [-]